This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2020 at 08:27:27 (UTC).

Howell v. C R Bard Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Howell filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leslie R. Hoffman and Paul G. Byron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01484

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leslie R. Hoffman

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Byron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Katherine Howell

Defendants

Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc.

McKesson Corporation

C R Bard Inc

Does 1 through 100, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darren McDowell

Attorney at Fears Nachawati, PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Eric Martin Przybysz

Attorney at Fears Nachawati Law Firm

5473 Bair Rd

Dallas, TX 75231

Steven Scott Schulte

Attorney at Fears Nachawati, PLLC

5473 Blair Rd

Dallas, TX 75231

Rebecca S. Vinocur

Attorney at Rebecca S. Vinocur, PA

5915 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ste 14

Coral Gables, FL 33146-2435

Defendant Attorneys

Melissa Dorman Matthews

Attorney at Hartline Barger LLP

8750 N Central Expwy Ste 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

Jordan E. Jarreau

Attorney at Hartline Barger LLP

8750 N Central Expwy Ste 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

Sabrina R. Gallo

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 4400

Miami, FL 33131

Rebecca A. Ocariz

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 4400

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#45

(#45) JOINT NOTICE by all parties of Correction to #44 Case Management Report. (Ocariz, Rebecca) Text modified on 10/20/2020 (RDO). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

44 #9

Exhibit I - CMO 3

44 #8

Exhibit H - CMO 9

44 #7

Exhibit G - CMO 14

44 #5

Exhibit E - CMLO 12

44 #3

Exhibit C - CMO 12

44 #2

Exhibit B - CMO 5 Plaintiff Profile Form

44 #1

Exhibit A - Transfer Order

#44

(#44) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - CMO 5 Plaintiff Profile Form, #3 Exhibit C - CMO 12, #4 Exhibit D - Stipulated Protective Order, #5 Exhibit E - CMLO 12, #6 Exhibit F - CMO 17, #7 Exhibit G - CMO 14, #8 Exhibit H - CMO 9, #9 Exhibit I - CMO 3, #10 Exhibit J - Fact Sheet Stipulation - Doc. 1153 - MDL)(Ocariz, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

1 #17

Exhibit(s) D-11 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral

1 #16

Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard

1 #15

Exhibit(s) D-9 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson

1 #14

Exhibit(s) D-8 - Dismissal Hearing Notice

1 #13

Exhibit(s) D-7 - Jury Demand

1 #12

Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to McKesson

1 #11

Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, Inc.

1 #8

Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10900626) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Jury Demand, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Dismissal Hearing Notice, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #17 Exhibit(s) D-11 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.] (Entered: 06/09/2020)

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#46) ENDORSED ORDER VACATING re 39 Order Denying Motion to Stay. The case is hereby STAYED for a period of 120 days to promote settlement. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/23/2020. (CPH) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) JOINT NOTICE by all parties of Correction to #44 Case Management Report. (Ocariz, Rebecca) Text modified on 10/20/2020 (RDO). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - CMO 5 Plaintiff Profile Form, #3 Exhibit C - CMO 12, #4 Exhibit D - Stipulated Protective Order, #5 Exhibit E - CMLO 12, #6 Exhibit F - CMO 17, #7 Exhibit G - CMO 14, #8 Exhibit H - CMO 9, #9 Exhibit I - CMO 3, #10 Exhibit J - Fact Sheet Stipulation - Doc. 1153 - MDL)(Ocariz, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #35 Interested persons order by Katherine Howell. (Vinocur, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #34 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Katherine Howell. Related case(s): Yes (Vinocur, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #35 Interested persons order by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company ("BD"), Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ocariz, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #34 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. Related case(s): y (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ocariz, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ENDORSED ORDER denying #38 Motion to Stay. The parties have not established good cause for staying any deadlines pending a forthcoming potential settlement. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/16/2020. (CPH) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Joint MOTION to Stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Inc. (Gallo, Sabrina) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #31 Motion to Substitute Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 9/15/2020. (MDH) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.] (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.] (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.] (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.] (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.] (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 5 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.] (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.] (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.] (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.] (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10900626) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Jury Demand, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Dismissal Hearing Notice, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #17 Exhibit(s) D-11 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 8/25/2020.] (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where McKesson Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Martin Przybysz