This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/02/2022 at 19:12:10 (UTC).

Howell et al v. Argent Trust Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 Howell filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Argent Trust Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03959

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Phyllis Michele Howell

Simon Reisert

Carole Speight

Defendants

Argent Trust Company

North Highland ESOP Holdings, Inc.

The North Highland Company, Inc.

The North Highland Comapny LLC

The North Highland Holding Co., LLC

Dan Reardon

Alex Bombeck

Beth Schiavo

Lauren Childers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Laura E. Babiak

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser LLP -C. WV

209 Capitol Street

Charleston, WV 25301

Ryan T. Jenny

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser LLP-DC

1055 Thomas Jefferson St., N.W.

Washington, DC 20007

Douglas P. Needham

Attorney at Izard, Kindall & Raabe, LLP

29 South Main Street, Suite 305

West Hartford, CT 06107

Gregory Y. Porter

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser LLP-DC

1055 Thomas Jefferson St., N.W.

Washington, DC 20007

James M. Evangelista

Attorney at Evangelista Worley LLC

500 Sugar Mill Road, Suite 245A

Atlanta, GA 30350

Kristi Stahnke McGregor

Attorney at Evangelista Worley LLC

500 Sugar Mill Road, Suite 245A

Atlanta, GA 30350

Mark George Boyko

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser

34 N. Gore Avenue, Suite 102

Webster Groves, MO 63119

Robert A. Izard, Jr

Attorney at Izard Kindall & Raabe, LLP

29 South Main St.

West Hartford, CT 06107

Defendant Attorneys

Rachel Frazier Gage

Attorney at Robbins Alloy Belinfante Littlefield LLC

500 14Th Street, N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30318

Julian L. Andre

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3200

Los Angles, CA 90064

Theodore M. Becker

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP - IL

444 West Lake Street

Chicago, IL 60606-029

Alan Shane Nichols

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery

1180 Peachtree Street Ne, Ste 3350

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

38 #3

Exhibit B - Fourth Amendment to North Highland ESOP and 401(k)

38 #2

Exhibit A - North Highland Summary Plan Description

38 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Mark G. Boyko

38 #38

Main Document

#37

(#37) ORDER granting Joint Motion to Postpone the Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Set a Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Motion to Stay the Litigation #36 . The Court hereby POSTPONES the deadline for Defendants to respond to the Complaint, and ADOPTS the following briefing schedule: Plaintiffs' motion to stay shall be filed by November 28, 2022; Defendants' brief in opposition to Plaintiffs motion to stay shall be filed by December 12, 2022; and Plaintiffs' reply in support of their motion to stay shall be filed by December 30, 2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/25/2022. (gas) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

36 #1

Text of Proposed Order

36 #36

Main Document

#34

RESTRICTED

#33

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) Electronic Summons Issued as to Alex Bombeck. (gas) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#7

(#7) Electronic Summons Issued as to Dan Reardon. (gas) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#6

(#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to The North Highland Holding Co., LLC. (gas) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#5

(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to The North Highland Comapny LLC. (gas) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#4

(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to The North Highland Company, Inc. (gas) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to North Highland ESOP Holdings, Inc. (gas) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Argent Trust Company. (gas) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Phyllis Michele Howell, Simon Reisert, Carole Speight. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark G. Boyko, #2 Exhibit A - North Highland Summary Plan Description, #3 Exhibit B - Fourth Amendment to North Highland ESOP and 401(k))(Porter, Gregory) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER granting Joint Motion to Postpone the Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Set a Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Motion to Stay the Litigation #36 . The Court hereby POSTPONES the deadline for Defendants to respond to the Complaint, and ADOPTS the following briefing schedule: Plaintiffs' motion to stay shall be filed by November 28, 2022; Defendants' brief in opposition to Plaintiffs motion to stay shall be filed by December 12, 2022; and Plaintiffs' reply in support of their motion to stay shall be filed by December 30, 2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/25/2022. (gas) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #34 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Julian L. Andre. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on November 24, 2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc) (Entered: 11/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #33 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Theodore M. Becker. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on November 24, 2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(slc) (Entered: 11/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Joint MOTION to Postpone the Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Set a Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Motion to Stay the Litigation by Phyllis Michele Howell, Simon Reisert, Carole Speight. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Porter, Gregory) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Frazier Gage on behalf of Argent Trust Company (Gage, Rachel) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #34 APPLICATION for Admission of Julian L. Andre Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12213005). Attorney Julian L. Andre added appearing on behalf of Alex Bombeck, Lauren Childers, North Highland ESOP Holdings, Inc., Dan Reardon, Beth Schiavo, The North Highland Comapny LLC, The North Highland Company, Inc., The North Highland Holding Co., LLC (pdt) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #33 APPLICATION for Admission of Theodore M. Becker Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12212870). Attorney Theodore M. Becker added appearing on behalf of Alex Bombeck, Lauren Childers, North Highland ESOP Holdings, Inc., Dan Reardon, Beth Schiavo, The North Highland Comapny LLC, The North Highland Company, Inc., The North Highland Holding Co., LLC (pdt) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) APPLICATION for Admission of Julian L. Andre Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12213005).by Alex Bombeck, Lauren Childers, North Highland ESOP Holdings, Inc., Dan Reardon, Beth Schiavo, The North Highland Comapny LLC, The North Highland Company, Inc., The North Highland Holding Co., LLC. (Nichols, Alan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) APPLICATION for Admission of Theodore M. Becker Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12212870).by Alex Bombeck, Lauren Childers, North Highland ESOP Holdings, Inc., Dan Reardon, Beth Schiavo, The North Highland Comapny LLC, The North Highland Company, Inc., The North Highland Holding Co., LLC. (Nichols, Alan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Electronic Summons Issued as to Lauren Childers. (gas) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Electronic Summons Issued as to Beth Schiavo. (gas) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Electronic Summons Issued as to Alex Bombeck. (gas) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Electronic Summons Issued as to Dan Reardon. (gas) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to The North Highland Holding Co., LLC. (gas) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to The North Highland Comapny LLC. (gas) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to The North Highland Company, Inc. (gas) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to North Highland ESOP Holdings, Inc. (gas) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Argent Trust Company. (gas) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Simon Reisert, Carole Speight, Phyllis Michele Howell. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12103408) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH HIGHLAND COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ARGENT TRUST COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer A. Shane Nichols