Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/10/2021 at 07:36:37 (UTC).

Howe v. Albertson's LLC

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Howe filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Albertson's LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy J. Koppe and Gloria M. Navarro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01097

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Howe

Defendant

Albertson's LLC doing business as Albertson's

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Albert N Lasso

Attorney at Law Offices of Al Lasso, LLC

10160 Park Run Drive, Ste. 150

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Defendant Attorneys

Jack P. Burden

Attorney at Backus Carranza

3050 South Durango Drive, 872-5555, Fax: 872-5545

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Jessica Elizabeth Brown

Attorney at Backus Carranza

3050 S Durango Dr

Las Vegas, NV 89117

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/9/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/24/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

1 #7

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #2

Index Index of Exhibits

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-21-833533-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6517593) by Albertson's LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover Sheet, #2 Index Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E) (Burden, Jack) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 06/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/9/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/24/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (HAM) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-21-833533-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6517593) by Albertson's LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover Sheet, #2 Index Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E) (Burden, Jack) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALBERTSON'S COMPANIES LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant