This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2019 at 07:52:53 (UTC).

Howarth v. Kitchen Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 Howarth filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Kitchen Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dominic J. Squatrito. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01635

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dominic J. Squatrito

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Morgan Howarth

Defendants

The Kitchen Company, Inc.

Kitchen Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Dunne

Attorney at Sriplaw

125 Maiden Lane, Suite 5C

New York, NY 10038

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Order Dismissing Case

#10

(#10) AO 121 Report on the Determination of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Order Dismissing Case) (Pipech, L.) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

7 #1

Copy of Complaint

#7

(#7) AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Morgan Howarth, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 10/18/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#5

(#5) Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/16/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/16/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/16/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2019. Discovery due by 4/16/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Proposed Summons for The Kitchen Company, Inc.

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Demand Letter

1 #2

Exhibit 2- Infringement

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Certificate

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (INJUNCTIVE RELIEF DEMANDED) against The Kitchen Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5487894.), filed by Morgan Howarth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2- Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letter, #4 Proposed Summons for The Kitchen Company, Inc., #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AO 121 Report on the Determination of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Order Dismissing Case) (Pipech, L.) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Pipech, L.) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • (#9) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The plaintiff has personally represented to the Court that the case has settled. Therefore, the Court now orders that this case be dismissed with prejudice. This dismissal is without costs to either party. The Clerk is hereby directed to close this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 11/8/19.(Pike, C.) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • (#8) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Dominic J. Squatrito for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 10/29/2019.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Morgan Howarth, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 10/18/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/16/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/16/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/16/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2019. Discovery due by 4/16/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2019. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (INJUNCTIVE RELIEF DEMANDED) against The Kitchen Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5487894.), filed by Morgan Howarth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2- Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letter, #4 Proposed Summons for The Kitchen Company, Inc., #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.