This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2020 at 09:38:28 (UTC).

Howarth v. Texas Ally Real Estate Group, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Howarth filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Texas Ally Real Estate Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00958

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Morgan Howarth

Defendants

Ferguson Azille

Texas Ally Real Estate Group, LLC

Juston Martinez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Buckner McKinney

Attorney at Law Office of Buck McKinney, PC

P.O. Box 6231

Austin, TX 78762-6231

Defendant Attorney

Keith Steven McMahon

Attorney at The Kelly Legal Group, PLLC

Po Box 2125

Austin, TX 78768-2125

 

Court Documents

9 #3

Exhibit Ex C 2020.10.15 Affidavit of Facts

9 #2

Exhibit Ex B 2020.02.17 TREC Termination

9 #1

Exhibit Ex A Azille website Date Stamped (Wayback)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Keith Steven McMahon added to party Juston Martinez(pty:dft) by Juston Martinez, Texas Ally Real Estate Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Azille website Date Stamped (Wayback), #2 Exhibit Ex B 2020.02.17 TREC Termination, #3 Exhibit Ex C 2020.10.15 Affidavit of Facts)(McMahon, Keith) Modified on 10/16/2020 to add filer (td). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Howarth. Texas Ally Real Estate Group, LLC served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (McKinney, Robert) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Howarth. Juston Martinez served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (McKinney, Robert) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Ferguson Azille, Juston Martinez, Texas Ally Real Estate Group, LLC. (cj) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#5

(#5) Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights, along with a copy of the Complaint. (cj) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Morgan Howarth. Azille Summons (McKinney, Robert) (Main Document 4 replaced and flattened on 9/16/2020) (cj). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Morgan Howarth. Martinez Summons (McKinney, Robert) (Main Document 3 replaced and flattened on 9/16/2020) (cj). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Morgan Howarth. Texas Ally Summons (McKinney, Robert) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 9/16/2020) (cj). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13972901), filed by Morgan Howarth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McKinney, Robert) (Attachment 2 replaced and flattened on 9/16/2020) (cj). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Keith Steven McMahon added to party Juston Martinez(pty:dft) by Juston Martinez, Texas Ally Real Estate Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Azille website Date Stamped (Wayback), #2 Exhibit Ex B 2020.02.17 TREC Termination, #3 Exhibit Ex C 2020.10.15 Affidavit of Facts)(McMahon, Keith) Modified on 10/16/2020 to add filer (td). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Howarth. Texas Ally Real Estate Group, LLC served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (McKinney, Robert) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Howarth. Juston Martinez served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (McKinney, Robert) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Ferguson Azille, Juston Martinez, Texas Ally Real Estate Group, LLC. (cj) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights, along with a copy of the Complaint. (cj) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Morgan Howarth. (cj) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Morgan Howarth. Azille Summons (McKinney, Robert) (Main Document 4 replaced and flattened on 9/16/2020) (cj). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Morgan Howarth. Martinez Summons (McKinney, Robert) (Main Document 3 replaced and flattened on 9/16/2020) (cj). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Morgan Howarth. Texas Ally Summons (McKinney, Robert) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 9/16/2020) (cj). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13972901), filed by Morgan Howarth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McKinney, Robert) (Attachment 2 replaced and flattened on 9/16/2020) (cj). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less