This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:19:33 (UTC).

Howard v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Howard filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05504

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lysandra Howard

Defendants

John Doe

Wal-Mart Stores Inc.

Walmart Store #2475

XYZ Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sara J. Wardlow

Attorney at Sapp Law Firm, LLC

4760 Lawrenceville Highway, Suite D-1

Lilburn, GA 30047

Rebecca Kay Sapp

Attorney at Sapp Law Firm, LLC

Suite 201, 1394 Indian Trail Lilburn Road

Norcross, GA 30093

Defendant Attorneys

Jennie Estes Rogers

Attorney at McLain & Merritt, P.C.

Suite 500, 3445 Peachtree Road, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326

Howard M. Lessinger

Attorney at McLain & Merritt, P.C.

Suite 500, 3445 Peachtree Road, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Lessinger, Howard) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit Email communications

#12

(#12) RESPONSE re #9 Order (Defendant's Response to Order Entered January 6, 2020) filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Walmart Store #2475. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email communications)(Lessinger, Howard) Modified on 1/22/2020 to edit text (jap). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lysandra Howard filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Lessinger, Howard) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant Walmart Stores, Inc. d/b/a Walmart Inc., First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Lysandra Howard.(Wardlow, Sara) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Wal-Mart Stores Inc..(Lessinger, Howard) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) Initial Disclosures by Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Walmart Store #2475.(Lessinger, Howard) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. d/b/a Walmart Inc. and Walmart Store #2475 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9156325). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 12/10/2019 to correct filer information (jap). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery (Subpoenas to Non-Parties) by Wal-Mart Stores Inc..(Lessinger, Howard) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff, through her counsel, to contact Defendant Walmart's counsel to set up the conference required by LR 16.1. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this order, the Court DIRECTS Plaintiff, via her counsel, to follow the procedures set forth in Local Rule 16.1. If Plaintiff, via her counsel, fails to follow either of these directions within the time specified, the Court DIRECTS Defendant Walmart to file a notice on the docket indicating as much. Within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order, the Court DIRECTS the Parties to jointly file the JPRDP pursuant to Local Rule 16.2. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/6/20. (jpa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate Sam's East, Inc., Other Affiliate Sam's Real Estate Business Trust, Other Affiliate Claims Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Other Affiliate ASDA Group Limited, Other Affiliate Beaver Lake Aviation, Inc., Other Affiliate Bharti Walmart Private Limited, Other Affiliate Central American Retail Holding Company N.V., Other Affiliate Corporacion de Companias Agroindustriales, Other Affiliate Corporacion de Supermercados Unidos S.A., Other Affiliate Distribucion y Servicio D&S S.A., Other Affiliate La Fruga S.A., Other Affiliate Massmart Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Sam's West, Inc., Other Affiliate Texas Retail Energy, LLC, Other Affiliate The Seiyu, Ltd., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Argentina S.R.L., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Brasil, Ltda., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Canada Corp., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart China Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Leasing, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Other Affiliate WMS SUPERMERCADOS DO BRASIL, S.A. (formerly Sonae Distribuicao Brasil S.A.), Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Other Affiliate Walmart de Mexico, S.A. de C.V. for Wal-Mart Stores Inc. by Wal-Mart Stores Inc..(Lessinger, Howard) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint within #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. and Walmart Store #2475. Discovery ends on 5/4/2020. (Originally filed in State Court) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE re #9 Order (Defendant's Response to Order Entered January 6, 2020) filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Walmart Store #2475. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email communications)(Lessinger, Howard) Modified on 1/22/2020 to edit text (jap). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery (Subpoenas to Non-Parties) by Wal-Mart Stores Inc..(Lessinger, Howard) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff, through her counsel, to contact Defendant Walmart's counsel to set up the conference required by LR 16.1. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this order, the Court DIRECTS Plaintiff, via her counsel, to follow the procedures set forth in Local Rule 16.1. If Plaintiff, via her counsel, fails to follow either of these directions within the time specified, the Court DIRECTS Defendant Walmart to file a notice on the docket indicating as much. Within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order, the Court DIRECTS the Parties to jointly file the JPRDP pursuant to Local Rule 16.2. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/6/20. (jpa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant Walmart Stores, Inc. d/b/a Walmart Inc., First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Lysandra Howard.(Wardlow, Sara) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Lessinger, Howard) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate Sam's East, Inc., Other Affiliate Sam's Real Estate Business Trust, Other Affiliate Claims Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Other Affiliate ASDA Group Limited, Other Affiliate Beaver Lake Aviation, Inc., Other Affiliate Bharti Walmart Private Limited, Other Affiliate Central American Retail Holding Company N.V., Other Affiliate Corporacion de Companias Agroindustriales, Other Affiliate Corporacion de Supermercados Unidos S.A., Other Affiliate Distribucion y Servicio D&S S.A., Other Affiliate La Fruga S.A., Other Affiliate Massmart Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Sam's West, Inc., Other Affiliate Texas Retail Energy, LLC, Other Affiliate The Seiyu, Ltd., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Argentina S.R.L., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Brasil, Ltda., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Canada Corp., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart China Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Leasing, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Other Affiliate WMS SUPERMERCADOS DO BRASIL, S.A. (formerly Sonae Distribuicao Brasil S.A.), Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Other Affiliate Walmart de Mexico, S.A. de C.V. for Wal-Mart Stores Inc. by Wal-Mart Stores Inc..(Lessinger, Howard) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Disclosures by Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Walmart Store #2475.(Lessinger, Howard) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lysandra Howard filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Lessinger, Howard) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Wal-Mart Stores Inc..(Lessinger, Howard) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint within #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. and Walmart Store #2475. Discovery ends on 5/4/2020. (Originally filed in State Court) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. d/b/a Walmart Inc. and Walmart Store #2475 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9156325). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 12/10/2019 to correct filer information (jap). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.