This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2021 at 08:42:00 (UTC).

HOWARD v. UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 HOWARD filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN M. GALLAGHER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-03517

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN M. GALLAGHER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARSHA HOWARD

Defendants

UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.

JACK BURNT

SHILEN BROCKINGTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CATHERINE W. SMITH

Attorney at DEREK SMITH LAW GROUP

1835 Market St Suite 2950

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Designation Form

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARSHA HOWARD re: Joseph Jackson served Summons and Complaint upon JACK BURNT by Personal. JACK BURNT served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (SMITH, CATHERINE) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARSHA HOWARD re: Gary Winfrey served Summons and Complaint upon UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. by Personal. UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (SMITH, CATHERINE) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Alan Focht re: served Summons upon Gloria Pereira by Personal on 9/20/2021 (SMITH, CATHERINE) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to SHILEN BROCKINGTON, JACK BURNT, UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/9/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by MARSHA HOWARD. (JL ) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15321980.), filed by MARSHA HOWARD. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(SMITH, CATHERINE) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Parcel Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CATHERINE W. SMITH