This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2022 at 07:45:52 (UTC).

Howard v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 Howard filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Juul Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-05227

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Arthur Howard, III

Defendants

Altria Group, Inc.

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

Altria Group Distribution Company

Altria Enterprises LLC

James Monsees

Adam Bowen

Nicholas Pritzker

Ho Young Huh

Riaz Valani

Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc.

Alternative Ingredients, Inc.

Tobacco Technology, Inc.

eLiquitech, Inc.

McLane Company, Inc.

Eby-Brown Company, LLC

Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory F. Coleman

Attorney at Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC

800 S. Gay Street, Suite 1100

Knoxville, TN 37929

Benjamin A. Kaplan

Attorney at Crueger Dickinson LLC

4532 North Oakland Avenue

Whitefish Bay, WI 53211

Charles J. Crueger

Attorney at Crueger Dickinson LLC

4532 North Oakland Avenue

Whitefish Bay, WI 53211

Edward A. Wallace

Attorney at Wallace Miller

150 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60606

Erin K. Dickinson

Attorney at Crueger Dickinson LLC

4532 North Oakland Avenue

Whitefish Bay, WI 53211

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Coleman, Gregory) (Filed on 9/13/2022) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. (Coleman, Gregory) (Filed on 9/19/2022) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Adam Bowen, Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Ho Young Huh, James Monsees, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Philip Morris USA, Inc., Riaz Valani, Tobacco Technology, Inc., eLiquitech, Inc.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2022) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Arthur Howard, III (Coleman, Gregory) (Filed on 9/27/2022) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Arthur Howard, III (Coleman, Gregory) (Filed on 9/27/2022) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Adam Bowen, Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Ho Young Huh, James Monsees, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Philip Morris USA, Inc., Riaz Valani, Tobacco Technology, Inc., eLiquitech, Inc.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2022) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (Coleman, Gregory) (Filed on 9/19/2022) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. The complaint does not list the Retailer defendants. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #1 Compla int, filed by James Arthur Howard (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2022) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2913: Opened in California Northern District as 22-cv-05227-WHO Howard v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al cc: JPMDL (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2022) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Coleman, Gregory) (Filed on 9/13/2022) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2022) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT-FORM Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against Adam Bowen, Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Ho Young Huh, James Monsees, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Philip Morris USA, Inc., Riaz Valani, Tobacco Technology, Inc., eLiquitech, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ACANDC-17531181.). Filed by James Arthur Howard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Coleman, Gregory) (Filed on 9/13/2022) Modified on 9/13/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/14/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eby-Brown Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Philip Morris USA, Inc. is a litigant