This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2019 at 07:26:00 (UTC).

Howard v. Gardner et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 a Prisoner - Other Prisoner case was filed by Howard against Gardner in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-02418

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Becky R. Thorson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Joseph Howard

Respondents

Brian D. Gardner

Linn County, Iowa

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER Transferring this petition to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/1/2019. (SMD) cc: Howard. Modified text on 10/4/2019 (MTP). (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re FINDING OF FACT. (JGK) Document QC'd on 9/18/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 09/03/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 3-15686) filed by Joseph Howard. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) cc: Howard. Document QC'd on 9/18/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 09/03/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • NOTICE: The case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of Iowa. (MTP) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER Transferring this petition to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/1/2019. (SMD) cc: Howard. Modified text on 10/4/2019 (MTP). (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re FINDING OF FACT. (JGK) Document QC'd on 9/18/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 3-15686) filed by Joseph Howard. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) cc: Howard. Document QC'd on 9/18/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.