This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/07/2021 at 09:59:07 (UTC).

Howard v. City Hall

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 Howard filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City Hall. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew W. McFarland and Karen L. Litkovitz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00159

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. McFarland

Referral Judge

Karen L. Litkovitz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chyrie Howard

Cincinnati, OH 45217

Defendant

City Hall

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Complaint

1 #3

Summons Form

1 #4

Form USM-285

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/15/2021. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT: The complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Objections to R&R due by 3/30/2021. (kh) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT filed by Chyrie Howard against City Hall. (kh) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and authorizing commencement of this action without prepayment of fees or costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/16/2021. (kh) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Chyrie Howard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons Form, #4 Form USM-285) (kh) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY HALL is a litigant