This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2023 at 07:50:48 (UTC).

Brandon Howard v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 Brandon Howard filed an Other lawsuit against Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen E. Scott. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:23-CV-00049

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandon Howard

Defendant

Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Joseph Lawler

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Fee Exemption in accordance with statute, filed by Plaintiff Brandon Howard. (Attorney Brian Joseph Lawler added to party Brandon Howard(pty:pla))(Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brandon Howard. (Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brandon Howard, (Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Brandon Howard. (Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

5 #1

CV-11C

#6

(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Brandon Howard. Dismissal is with. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) ORDER RE NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott, re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #7 . Having properly read and considered the Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice, the matter of Brandon Howard v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Case No. 8:23-cv-00049-KES, is hereby dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Each party is to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RE NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott, re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #7 . Having properly read and considered the Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice, the matter of Brandon Howard v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Case No. 8:23-cv-00049-KES, is hereby dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Each party is to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Brandon Howard. Dismissal is with. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Brandon Howard. (Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brandon Howard, (Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brandon Howard. (Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Fee Exemption in accordance with statute, filed by Plaintiff Brandon Howard. (Attorney Brian Joseph Lawler added to party Brandon Howard(pty:pla))(Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less