This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2021 at 06:10:47 (UTC).

HOWARD v. AUROBINDO PHARMA, LTD. et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 HOWARD filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against AUROBINDO PHARMA, LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert B. Kugler and Karen M. Williams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-12959

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert B. Kugler

Referral Judge

Karen M. Williams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LISA HOWARD

Defendants

PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.

SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S., LLC

AUROBINDO PHARMA, LTD.

AUROLIFE PHARMA, LLC

ARROW PHARM (MALTA) LTD.

HUAHAI U.S. INC.

AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.

MYLAN N.V.

Walgreens Boots Alliance

MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD.

DOES 1-100

ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.

MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

JOHN DOE

In Re

VALSARTAN LOSARTAN AND IRBESARTAN PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL A. NIGH

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDCNJ BAR

316 S. Baylen, Suite 600

Pensacola, FL 32502

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) STIPULATION of Dismissal by ARROW PHARM (MALTA) LTD.. (LOCKARD, VICTORIA) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ARROW PHARM (MALTA) LTD., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA, LTD., AUROLIFE PHARMA, LLC, HUAHAI U.S. INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S., LLC, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, ) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ARROW PHARM (MALTA) LTD., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA, LTD., AUROLIFE PHARMA, LLC, DOES 1-100, HUAHAI U.S. INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S., LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance, ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12576230) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LISA HOWARD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(NIGH, DANIEL) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION of Dismissal by ARROW PHARM (MALTA) LTD.. (LOCKARD, VICTORIA) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketMember Case Direct File on 6/24/2021, for MDL 2875 VALSARTAN LOSARTAN AND IRBESARTAN PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. (pr, ) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketFor all Case Management Orders #click here (pr, ) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ARROW PHARM (MALTA) LTD., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA, LTD., AUROLIFE PHARMA, LLC, HUAHAI U.S. INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S., LLC, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, ) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ORDER Pursuant to L. CIV. R. 7.1.1 (eff. June 21, 2021), the parties, including intervening parties, are required to file a statement (separate from any pleading) containing specific information regarding third-party litigation funding. See L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(a)(1-3). This statement shall be filed within 45 days of the effective date of this Rule, or no later than August 5, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/28/21. (nar) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ARROW PHARM (MALTA) LTD., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA, LTD., AUROLIFE PHARMA, LLC, DOES 1-100, HUAHAI U.S. INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S., LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance, ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12576230) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LISA HOWARD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(NIGH, DANIEL) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARROW PHARM (MALTA) LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where Aurolife Pharma, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VALSARTAN LOSARTAN AND IRBESARTAN PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL, CO., LTD is a litigant