This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2022 at 07:16:38 (UTC).

HOWARD v. AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 HOWARD filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00259

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTIN M. HOWARD

Defendants

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC.

CBS CORPORATION

CLEAVER BROOKS, INC.

COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION

COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC

CORNING, INC.

CRANE COMPANY

EATON CORPORATION

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

FOSECO, INC.

FOSTER -WHEELER LLC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GENUINE PARTS CO.

GOODRICH CORPORATION

THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

GOULDS PUMPS, LLC

GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC.

GTE OPERATIONS SUPPORT, INC.

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren Linsenbach

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter G. Angelos, PC

2001 N. Front St.

Ste Bldg 3, SU 330

JASON B. DUNCAN

Attorney at Law Offices of Peter Angelos

2001 N. Front Street, Suite 330

Harrisburg, PA 17102

Defendant Attorneys

ADAM A. DESIPIO

Attorney at DLA PIPER LLP

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

CORY C. SIDELSKY

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

1650 Market Street, Suite 5000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Other Attorneys

TIFFANY F. TURNER

Attorney at DICKIE MCCAMEY & CHILCOTE

1650 Arch Street, Suite 2110

Philadelphia, PA 19103

W. MATTHEW REBER

Attorney at KELLEY JASON MCGUIRE & SPINELLI & HANNA

Two Liberty Place, Suite 1900

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHN CRANE, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15674563), filed by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/20/2022) (sbt). (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by CORY C. SIDELSKY on behalf of COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(SIDELSKY, CORY) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM A. DESIPIO on behalf of COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(DESIPIO, ADAM) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JASON B. DUNCAN on behalf of MARTIN M. HOWARD with Certificate of Service(DUNCAN, JASON) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JOHN CRANE, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION.(SIDELSKY, CORY) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#9

(#9) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC..(REBER, W.) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY JOHN CRANE (ECF NO. 6), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT THAT THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.1 PLAINTIFFS MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN APRIL 8, 2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/8/2022.3/8/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY JOHN CRANE (ECF NO. 6), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT THAT THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.1 PLAINTIFFS MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN APRIL 8, 2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/8/2022.3/8/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC..(REBER, W.) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION.(SIDELSKY, CORY) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JOHN CRANE, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JASON B. DUNCAN on behalf of MARTIN M. HOWARD with Certificate of Service(DUNCAN, JASON) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM A. DESIPIO on behalf of COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(DESIPIO, ADAM) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by CORY C. SIDELSKY on behalf of COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(SIDELSKY, CORY) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHN CRANE, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15674563), filed by JOHN CRANE, INC..(TURNER, TIFFANY) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/20/2022) (sbt). (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Corning Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where FOSECO, INC. is a litigant