This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2020 at 07:13:46 (UTC).

HOWARD et al v. NORDIC CONSULTING, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 HOWARD filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against NORDIC CONSULTING, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN M. GALLAGHER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-05392

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN M. GALLAGHER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CYRIL EMIKO

FELICIA BELL

HELEN HOWARD

Defendant

NORDIC CONSULTING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SARAH SCHALMAN-BERGEN

Attorney at Berger Montague PC

1818 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

ALEXANDRA K. PIAZZA

Attorney at Berger Montague PC

1818 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

HAROLD L. LICHTEN

Attorney at LICHTEN & LISS-RIORDAN PC

729 Boylston St Suite 2000

Boston, MA 02116

OLENA SAVYTSKA

Attorney at LICHTEN & LISS-RIORDAN PC

729 Boylston St Suite 2000

Boston, MA 02116

Defendant Attorneys

KATHRYN MODEER

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St Louis, MO 63105

ANDREW J. WEISSLER

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza Suite 600

St Louis, MO 63105

SARAH K. QUINN

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP

120 South Riverside Plaza Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60606-3912

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#14

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#13

12 #1

Exhibit A - Opt In Consent Forms

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

6 #2

Certificate of Service

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

5 #2

Certificate of Service

#5

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF SARAH K. QUINN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 12/16/20. 12/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF, ANDREW J. WEISSLER, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 12/16/20. 12/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah K. Quinn by NORDIC CONSULTING, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14786746.). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(MODEER, KATHRYN) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee for PRO HAC VICE by NORDIC CONSULTING, INC.. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-14786722). (MODEER, KATHRYN) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of A.J. Weissler by NORDIC CONSULTING, INC... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(MODEER, KATHRYN) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by FELICIA BELL, CYRIL EMIKO, HELEN HOWARD of Filing Opt In Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opt In Consent Forms)(SAVYTSKA, OLENA) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF INITIAL TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Lead counsel shall appear VIA TELEPHONE for a Rule 16 conference in the above-captioned matter on Thursday, January 21, 2021 at 1:00 PM, by calling the United States District Court located at 504 West Hamilton Street, Suite 4701, Allentown, Pennsylvania, etc. (er, ) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Nordic Consulting Group Inc. with Certificate of Service by NORDIC CONSULTING, INC..(MODEER, KATHRYN) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by NORDIC CONSULTING, INC..(MODEER, KATHRYN) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY HAROLD L. LICHTEN TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 11/10/20. 11/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY OLENA SAVYTSKA TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 11/10/20. 11/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Harold L. Lichten ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14702912.) filed by FELICIA BELL, CYRIL EMIKO, HELEN HOWARD.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(SCHALMAN-BERGEN, SARAH) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Harold L. Lichten filed by FELICIA BELL, CYRIL EMIKO, HELEN HOWARD.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(SCHALMAN-BERGEN, SARAH) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY - TO BE RE-FILED WITH CORRECT EVENT) (va, ). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDRA K. PIAZZA on behalf of FELICIA BELL, CYRIL EMIKO, HELEN HOWARD with Certificate of Service(PIAZZA, ALEXANDRA) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Olena Savytska ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14694218.) filed by FELICIA BELL, CYRIL EMIKO, HELEN HOWARD.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(SCHALMAN-BERGEN, SARAH) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Gregory Kowal re: served Summons and Complaint upon Glenn Cole, CFO, by Personal Service on 11/03/2020 (SCHALMAN-BERGEN, SARAH) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to NORDIC CONSULTING, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/30/2020 (bw, ) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by FELICIA BELL, CYRIL EMIKO, HELEN HOWARD. (lisad, ) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NORDIC CONSULTING, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14673189.), filed by HELEN HOWARD, FELICIA BELL, CYRIL EMIKO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Opt-In Forms)(SCHALMAN-BERGEN, SARAH) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/30/2020) (lisad, ). (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah K Quinn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew J Weissler