This case was last updated from PACER on 04/03/2021 at 09:19:01 (UTC).

Howald v. Target Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 Howald filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jean C. Hamilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00129

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jean C. Hamilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jill L Howald

Jill L. Howald

Defendant

Target Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott L. Kolker

Attorney at KOLKER AND LABOVITZ LLC

7700 Bonhomme Ave, Suite 350

St. Louis, MO 63105

Defendant Attorney

Beth C. Boggs

Attorney at BOGGS AVELLINO LLC

9326 Olive Blvd., Suite 200

St. Louis, MO 63132

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 4/19/2021. Rule 16 Conference set for 4/29/2021 10:15 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 3/25/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Target Corporation.(Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Beth C. Boggs for Defendant Target Corporation. (Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

2 #1

Summons Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Jill L. Howald (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons)(Kolker, Scott) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

1 #2

Original Filing Form Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Target Corporation with receipt number AMOEDC-8448583, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Jill L Howald. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Kolker, Scott) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 4/19/2021. Rule 16 Conference set for 4/29/2021 10:15 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 3/25/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Target Corporation.(Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Beth C. Boggs for Defendant Target Corporation. (Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Scott L. Kolker. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (JWD) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Jill L. Howald (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons)(Kolker, Scott) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Target Corporation with receipt number AMOEDC-8448583, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Jill L Howald. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Kolker, Scott) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott L. Kolker