This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/02/2021 at 11:16:54 (UTC).

Howald et al v. Indian Harbor Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 Howald filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Indian Harbor Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nicholas P. Mizell and John E. Steele. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00960

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nicholas P. Mizell

Presiding Judge

John E. Steele

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Judith Howald

Timothy Howald

Defendant

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles P. Pearson

Attorney at Shelton Law, PLLC

2073 Summit Lake Drive., Suite 151

Tallahassee, FL 32317

Jeffery Remington Huggins

Attorney at Shelton Law, PLLC

2073 Summit Lake Drive., Suite 151

Tallahassee, FL 32317

Dale Scott Shelton

Attorney at Shelton Law, PLLC

2073 Summit Lake Dr.

Tallahassee, FL 32317-7949

Defendant Attorney

Michael James Raudebaugh

Attorney at Clausen Miller PC

4830 West Kennedy Blvd., Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/22/2021, Discovery due by 2/4/2022, Dispositive motions due by 3/25/2022, Pretrial statement due by 8/5/2022, All other motions due by 8/2/2022, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 11/5/2021, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 12/6/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2022 at 9:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele, Trial Term commencing 9/1/2022 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele, Conduct mediation hearing by 3/7/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 1/5/2021. (MLJ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Indian Harbor Insurance Company Related Case Notice (Raudebaugh, Michael) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#7

(#7) PRETRIAL AND DISCOVERY PLAN. (Raudebaugh, Michael) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Indian Harbor Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent XL Bermuda Ltd. (Bermuda), Corporate Parent Excel Holdings Limited (Cayman), Corporate Parent XL Group, Ltd. (Bermuda), Corporate Parent AXA SA (France), Corporate Parent XLIT Ltd. (Cayman), Corporate Parent AXA SA, Corporate Parent Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Corporate Parent XL Specialty Insurance Company (Delaware), Corporate Parent XL Reinsurance America Inc. (New York), Corporate Parent X.L. America, Inc. (Delaware) for Indian Harbor Insurance Company.. (Raudebaugh, Michael) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#5

(#5) Defendant Indian Harbor Insurance Company's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Indian Harbor Insurance Company.(Raudebaugh, Michael) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#4

(#4) TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/9/2020. (jmc) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Indian Harbor Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Timothy Howald, Judith Howald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(RMT) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial, case number 20-ca-007310 filed in State Court on 10/30/2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17626670 filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Raudebaugh, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/22/2021, Discovery due by 2/4/2022, Dispositive motions due by 3/25/2022, Pretrial statement due by 8/5/2022, All other motions due by 8/2/2022, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 11/5/2021, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 12/6/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2022 at 9:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele, Trial Term commencing 9/1/2022 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 A before Judge John E. Steele, Conduct mediation hearing by 3/7/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 1/5/2021. (MLJ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Raudebaugh, Michael) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Indian Harbor Insurance Company Related Case Notice (Raudebaugh, Michael) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRETRIAL AND DISCOVERY PLAN. (Raudebaugh, Michael) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Indian Harbor Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent XL Bermuda Ltd. (Bermuda), Corporate Parent Excel Holdings Limited (Cayman), Corporate Parent XL Group, Ltd. (Bermuda), Corporate Parent AXA SA (France), Corporate Parent XLIT Ltd. (Cayman), Corporate Parent AXA SA, Corporate Parent Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Corporate Parent XL Specialty Insurance Company (Delaware), Corporate Parent XL Reinsurance America Inc. (New York), Corporate Parent X.L. America, Inc. (Delaware) for Indian Harbor Insurance Company.. (Raudebaugh, Michael) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendant Indian Harbor Insurance Company's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Indian Harbor Insurance Company.(Raudebaugh, Michael) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/9/2020. (jmc) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Indian Harbor Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Timothy Howald, Judith Howald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(RMT) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-960-FtM-29NPM. (SJB) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial, case number 20-ca-007310 filed in State Court on 10/30/2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17626670 filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Raudebaugh, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dale Scott Shelton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles P. Pearson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Remington Huggins