This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/11/2021 at 11:23:01 (UTC).

Houx et al v. Mansour et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 Houx filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mansour. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aleta A. Trauger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00207

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aleta A. Trauger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shawn Duncan Houx

B.H.

Nathaniel Ryan Houx

Defendants

Nassar Isam Mansour

SK-MK, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron B. Woodard

Attorney at Law Office of Bart Durham

404 James Robertson Parkway, Suite 1712

Nashville, TN 37219

Blair Pierson Durham

Attorney at Bart Durham Injury Law

404 James Robertson Parkway, 1712 Parkway Towers

Nashville, TN 37219

Defendant Attorney

Earl W. Houston, II

Attorney at Martin, Tate, Morrow & Marston, P.C.

6410 Poplar Ave., Tower Ii, Suite 1000

Memphis, TN 38119

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #3

Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nathaniel Ryan Houx. SK-MK, Inc. waiver sent on 3/19/2021. (Woodard, Aaron) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nathaniel Ryan Houx. Nassar Isam Mansour waiver sent on 3/19/2021. (Woodard, Aaron) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SK-MK, Inc.. (Houston, Earl) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Nassar Isam Mansour, SK-MK, Inc..(Houston, Earl) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Aaron B. Woodard and Blair Pierson Durham admitted to this court. (ln) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Earl W. Houston, II admitted to this court-no local counsel required. (ln) Modified on 3/17/2021 (ds). (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2021 at 2:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ln) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nassar Isam Mansour and SK-MK, Inc. from Williamson County Circuit Court, case number 2020-439. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0650-3331279). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where B.H. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Earl W. Houston, II