This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2022 at 07:44:20 (UTC).

Houston v. United Financial Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 Houston filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against United Financial Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey V Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00367

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey V Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darlene Houston

Defendant

United Financial Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric David Nielsen

Attorney at The Nielsen Law Firm, P.C.

9800 Northwest Fwy, Suite 314

Houston, TX 77092

Defendant Attorneys

Mark R Lapidus

Attorney at Lapidus Knudsen PC

808 Travis Street, 18Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Megan L Knudsen

Attorney at Lapidus Knudsen

808 Travis Street, 18Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 405th Galveston County, case number 21-CV-2139 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27541044) filed by United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Lapidus, Mark) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/6/2022 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(CynthiaBenavides, 3) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Nielsen on behalf of Darlene Houston, filed. (Pohl, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Darlene Houston, filed.(Pohl, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Darlene Houston, filed.(Pohl, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Nielsen on behalf of Darlene Houston, filed. (Pohl, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/6/2022 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(CynthiaBenavides, 3) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 405th Galveston County, case number 21-CV-2139 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27541044) filed by United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Lapidus, Mark) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Financial Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Megan L Knudsen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark R Lapidus