This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/04/2022 at 08:31:09 (UTC).

Houston v. Extended Stay America

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 Houston filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Extended Stay America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04986

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adechi Houston

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant

Extended Stay America

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. I defer to the District Judge any determination as to whether Plaintiff's filing is frivolous, including whether this Court has subject matter jurisdiction, and ought to be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) along with any instructions to the Plaintiff regarding service and case management. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 12/10/2021. (bgt) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Notice of Filing

3 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing to Adechi Houston as to Adechi Houston regarding #4 Order. (mlb) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Adechi Houston re #2 Order. (bgt) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #3 Complaint for frivolity review, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (bgt) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Adechi Houston. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (bgt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. I defer to the District Judge any determination as to whether Plaintiff's filing is frivolous, including whether this Court has subject matter jurisdiction, and ought to be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) along with any instructions to the Plaintiff regarding service and case management. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 12/10/2021. (bgt) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (eop) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Adechi Houston. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Manual Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXTENDED STAY AMERICA INC. is a litigant