This case was last updated from PACER on 11/04/2019 at 07:03:47 (UTC).

Houston v. American Airlines , Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2019 Houston filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against American Airlines , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peggy Kuo and Margo K. Brodie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05065

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peggy Kuo

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Addie Houston

Defendants

John Doe Corporation

Jack Doe

American Airlines, Inc.

Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Abram I. Bohrer

Attorney at Bohrer and Lukeman

5 Columbus Circle, Ste. 1501

New York, NY 10019

David Arthur Zeitzoff

Attorney at Bohrer and Lukeman

5 Columbus Circle, Suite 1501, New York, Suite 1501

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorney

Nathan Bohlander

Attorney at Morgan & Akins

30 South 15Th Street, Suite 701

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Addie Houston. (Zeitzoff, David) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

16 #1

Proposed Discovery Plan

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on November 21, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan) (Riquelme, Claudia) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc.. (Bohlander, Nathan) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by American Airlines, Inc.. (Bohlander, Nathan) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Bohlander on behalf of Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bohlander, Nathan) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Bohlander on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Bohlander, Nathan) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

11 #1

American Airlines, Inc. Summons

#11

(#11) Summons Issued as to Amended Complaint as to American Airlines, Inc., Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 American Airlines, Inc. Summons) (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#10

(#10) Proposed Summons. Re #8 Amended Complaint by Addie Houston (Zeitzoff, David) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#9

(#9) Proposed Summons. Re #8 Amended Complaint by Addie Houston (Zeitzoff, David) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Airlines, Inc., Jack Doe, Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc., filed by Addie Houston. (Zeitzoff, David) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Bohlander on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bohlander, Nathan) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Addie Houston. American Airlines, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Zeitzoff, David) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by David Arthur Zeitzoff on behalf of Addie Houston (aty to be noticed) (Zeitzoff, David) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to American Airlines, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #17 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Court is not available on November 20, 2019. The Initial Conference set for November 21, 2019 is rescheduled to November 22, 2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11C South before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/28/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Addie Houston. (Zeitzoff, David) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on November 21, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan) (Riquelme, Claudia) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc.. (Bohlander, Nathan) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by American Airlines, Inc.. (Bohlander, Nathan) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Bohlander on behalf of Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bohlander, Nathan) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Bohlander on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Bohlander, Nathan) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Summons Issued as to Amended Complaint as to American Airlines, Inc., Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 American Airlines, Inc. Summons) (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Proposed Summons. Re #8 Amended Complaint by Addie Houston (Zeitzoff, David) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Proposed Summons. Re #8 Amended Complaint by Addie Houston (Zeitzoff, David) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Airlines, Inc., Jack Doe, Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc., filed by Addie Houston. (Zeitzoff, David) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Bohlander on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bohlander, Nathan) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Addie Houston. American Airlines, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Zeitzoff, David) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by David Arthur Zeitzoff on behalf of Addie Houston (aty to be noticed) (Zeitzoff, David) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to American Airlines, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11820942 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Addie Houston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Bohrer, Abram) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN AIRLINES INC, FKA US Airways is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Arthur Zeitzoff