This case was last updated from PACER on 09/22/2019 at 07:21:07 (UTC).

Houston Specialty Insurance Company v. Sound Pacific LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 Houston Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Sound Pacific LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara J. Rothstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01149

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara J. Rothstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Houston Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

Gunter Gerlach

Sound Pacific LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel D Colito

Attorney at LETHER & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

1848 Westlake Ave N, Ste 100

Seattle, WA 98109

Thomas Lether

Attorney at LETHER & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

1848 Westlake Ave N, Ste 100

Seattle, WA 98109

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Gunter Gerlach, Sound Pacific LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5858816), filed by Houston Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Sound Pacific LLC, #3 Summons Gunter Gellach)(Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

2 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Houston International Insurance Group, Ltd. for Houston Specialty Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Houston Specialty Insurance Company (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/17/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/24/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

1 #3

Summons Gunter Gellach

1 #2

Summons Sound Pacific LLC

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER: At the request of Plaintiff, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 11/1/2019. All other FRCP 26-related deadlines are adjusted accordingly. Failure to adhere to these deadlines may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/17/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/24/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Houston International Insurance Group, Ltd. for Houston Specialty Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Houston Specialty Insurance Company (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Gunter Gerlach, Sound Pacific LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/1/2019. (SNP) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SNP) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5858816), filed by Houston Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Sound Pacific LLC, #3 Summons Gunter Gellach)(Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.