This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/22/2019 at 07:35:25 (UTC).

Houston Specialty Insurance Company v. General Insurance Corporation of India

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 Houston Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against General Insurance Corporation of India. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00596

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Houston Specialty Insurance Company

Defendant

General Insurance Corporation of India

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brandon Francis Renken

Attorney at Locke Lord

600 Travis, Suite 2800

Houston, TX 77002

Nick J DiGiovanni

Attorney at Locke Lord et al

111 S Wacker Dr

Chicago, IL 60606

Ernesto Rafael Palomo

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

111 S Wacker Dr

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Margaret F Catalano

Attorney at Carroll McNulty Kull LLC

120 Mountain View Blvd

Basking Ridge, NJ 07920

Daisy Khambatta

Attorney at Kennedys CMK LLP

12600 Hill Country Blvd, Suite R-275

Austin, TX 78738

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Margaret F. Catalano to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Margaret F. Catalano to Appear Pro Hac Vice by General Insurance Corporation of India, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/16/2019. (Khambatta, Daisy) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER on Extension. By 4/26/2019, General Insurance Corporation of India must respond to this lawsuit #12 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading to the Complaint by General Insurance Corporation of India, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Khambatta, Daisy) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#11

(#11) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Houston Specialty Insurance Company served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/22/2019, filed.(Renken, Brandon) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#10

(#10) RETURN of Service, filed.(Renken, Brandon) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#9

(#9) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Houston Specialty Insurance Company served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019, filed.(Renken, Brandon) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Ernesto R. Palomo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Nick J. DiGiovanni to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Ernesto R. Palomo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Houston Specialty Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/21/2019. (Renken, Brandon) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Nick J. DiGiovanni to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Houston Specialty Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/21/2019. (Renken, Brandon) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 5/20/2019 at 11:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

3 #3

Continuation Summons Request

3 #2

Continuation Summons Request

3 #1

Continuation Summons Request

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Houston Specialty Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Summons Request, #2 Continuation Summons Request, #3 Continuation Summons Request)(Renken, Brandon) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Houston Specialty Insurance Company, filed.(Renken, Brandon) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Margaret F. Catalano to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Margaret F. Catalano to Appear Pro Hac Vice by General Insurance Corporation of India, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/16/2019. (Khambatta, Daisy) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER on Extension. By 4/26/2019, General Insurance Corporation of India must respond to this lawsuit #12 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading to the Complaint by General Insurance Corporation of India, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Khambatta, Daisy) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Houston Specialty Insurance Company served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/22/2019, filed.(Renken, Brandon) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RETURN of Service, filed.(Renken, Brandon) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Houston Specialty Insurance Company served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019, filed.(Renken, Brandon) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Ernesto R. Palomo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Nick J. DiGiovanni to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Ernesto R. Palomo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Houston Specialty Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/21/2019. (Renken, Brandon) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Nick J. DiGiovanni to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Houston Specialty Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/21/2019. (Renken, Brandon) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 5/20/2019 at 11:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Houston Specialty Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Summons Request, #2 Continuation Summons Request, #3 Continuation Summons Request)(Renken, Brandon) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Houston Specialty Insurance Company, filed.(Renken, Brandon) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against General Insurance Corporation of India (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21912411) filed by Houston Specialty Insurance Company.(Renken, Brandon) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where General Insurance Company Of America is a litigant