This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 11:02:41 (UTC).

Houston Jr v. Downey et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Houston Jr filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Downey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy J. Koppe and Gloria M. Navarro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01531

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brick Pommeloy Houston Jr

Indian Springs, NV 89070-0650

Defendants

Ellison

Offenders Management Division

Sgt Downey

Tony Podesta

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HDSP Law Library

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Exhibits, by Brick Pommeloy Houston Jr. (JQC) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Brick Pommeloy Houston Jr. Address updated to Southern Desert Correctional Center P.O. Box 208 Indian Springs, NV 89070. (JQC) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#5

(#5) Electronic NOTICE from HDSP, re ECF No. #4 IFP Application, that Plaintiff Brick Pommeloy Houston Jr. has transferred to SDCC. (KR) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brick Pommeloy Houston Jr. (JQC) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis, is Denied without prejudice to file a new fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three documents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before 10/20/2020, Plaintiff will either pay the full $400 filing fee for a civil action (which includes the $350 filing fee and the $50 administrative fee) or file with the Court: See Order for Details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff does not file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three documents or pay the full $400 filing fee for a civil action on or before 10/20/2020, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice for Plaintiff to refile the case with the Court, under a new case number. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - prisoner ifp/instructions sent to P - JQC) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#2

(#2) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Complaint

#1

(#1) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brick Pommeloy Houston Jr. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Cover Sheet) (JQC) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Exhibits, by Brick Pommeloy Houston Jr. (JQC) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Brick Pommeloy Houston Jr. Address updated to Southern Desert Correctional Center P.O. Box 208 Indian Springs, NV 89070. (JQC) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Electronic NOTICE from HDSP, re ECF No. #4 IFP Application, that Plaintiff Brick Pommeloy Houston Jr. has transferred to SDCC. (KR) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brick Pommeloy Houston Jr. (JQC) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis, is Denied without prejudice to file a new fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three documents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before 10/20/2020, Plaintiff will either pay the full $400 filing fee for a civil action (which includes the $350 filing fee and the $50 administrative fee) or file with the Court: See Order for Details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff does not file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three documents or pay the full $400 filing fee for a civil action on or before 10/20/2020, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice for Plaintiff to refile the case with the Court, under a new case number. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - prisoner ifp/instructions sent to P - JQC) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brick Pommeloy Houston Jr. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Cover Sheet) (JQC) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RT) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less