This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 18:43:51 (UTC).

Houston Home Dialysis LP v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 Houston Home Dialysis LP filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03791

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Defendants

Excellus Health Plan, Inc. d/b/a Excellus BlueCross BlueShield

HealthNow New York, Inc.

Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kentucky

Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc. d/b/a Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Dakota

Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc.

mpire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc. d/b/a Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield

Cambia Health Solutions, Inc.

California Physicians Service, Inc. d/b/a Blue Shield of California

BCBSM, Inc. d/b/a/ Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota

Hawaii Medical Service Association d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Hawaii

Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois

Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc.

Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Colorado

Capital Blue Cross

Health Care Service Corporation

Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.

Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Indiana

Blue Cross And Blue Shield of Michigan

Blue Shield of Northeastern New York

Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut

54 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Earnest William Wotring

Attorney at Baker Wotring LLP

700 Jpmorgan Chase Tower, 600 Travis

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Attachment A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT of Transfer received via Email notification: transfer of case to Northern District of Alabama. New Case # assigned: 2:19-cv-01765 and received on 10/31/2019., filed. (BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Alabama. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-35) transferring case to Northern District of Alabama to be included in MDL Docket No. 2406. (lgouadi, 4) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Houston Home Dialysis, filed.(Wotring, Earnest) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23289899) filed by Houston Home Dialysis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wotring, Earnest) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cambia Health Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HealthNow New York, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hawaii Medical Services Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc. is a litigant