This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 04:56:09 (UTC).

Houston Home Dialysis LP v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama et al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 Houston Home Dialysis LP filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is R David Proctor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01765

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R David Proctor

 

Party Details

Defendants

Excellus Health Plan, Inc. d/b/a Excellus BlueCross BlueShield

Anthem Health Plans Inc

National Account Service Company, LLC

CareFirst Inc

Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc. d/b/a Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Dakota

Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc.

BCBSM Inc

Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service Inc

Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.

Horizon Health Care Services, Inc. d/b/a Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey

Community Insurance Company

Anthem Health Plans of Virginia Inc

Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois

Capital Blue Cross

Independence Blue Cross

CareFirst of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a/ CareFirst BlueCross BlueShield

California Physicians Service Inc

ANTHEM INSURANCE COMPANIES INC

Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin

Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan

54 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Earnest William Wotring

Attorney at Connelly Baker Wotring LLP

700 Jpmorgan Chase Tower, 600 Travis

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Attachment A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-03791. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Alabama. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/31/2019.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-35) transferring case to Northern District of Alabama to be included in MDL Docket No. 2406. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/31/2019.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Houston Home Dialysis, filed.(Wotring, Earnest) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/31/2019.] (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/31/2019.] (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23289899) filed by Houston Home Dialysis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wotring, Earnest) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/31/2019.] (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL ACCOUNT SERVICES GROUP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CareFirst Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Carefirst of Maryland is a litigant