This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 07:29:13 (UTC).

HOUSTON et al v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 HOUSTON filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against MERCK CO , INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is HARVEY BARTLE, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03067

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HARVEY BARTLE, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUSAN HOUSTON

LEROY HOUSTON

Defendants

MERCK & CO., INC.

MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADAM T. FUNK

Attorney at POTTS LAW FIRM

3737 Buffalo Speedway, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorney

DINO S. SANGIAMO

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

750 E Pratt St Ste 900

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SUSAN HOUSTON, LEROY HOUSTON. MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. waiver sent on 7/26/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (FUNK, ADAM) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SUSAN HOUSTON, LEROY HOUSTON. MERCK & CO., INC. waiver sent on 7/26/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (FUNK, ADAM) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15244099.), filed by SUSAN HOUSTON, LEROY HOUSTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(FUNK, ADAM) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SUSAN HOUSTON, LEROY HOUSTON. MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. waiver sent on 7/26/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (FUNK, ADAM) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SUSAN HOUSTON, LEROY HOUSTON. MERCK & CO., INC. waiver sent on 7/26/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (FUNK, ADAM) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/12/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by LEROY HOUSTON, SUSAN HOUSTON. (JL ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15244099.), filed by SUSAN HOUSTON, LEROY HOUSTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(FUNK, ADAM) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DINO S. SANGIAMO