This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/12/2021 at 12:53:52 (UTC).

Houston Casualty Company v. Hudson Excess Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Houston Casualty Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hudson Excess Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jed S. Rakoff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03182

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jed S. Rakoff

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Houston Casualty Company

Defendant

Hudson Excess Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jan H. Duffalo

Attorney at London Fischer LLP

59 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Defendant Attorney

Steven Irwin Lewbel

Attorney at Melito & Adolfsen, P.C.

233 Broadway Suite 1010

New York, NY 10279

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 7/12/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 7/12/2021. Motions due by 9/10/2021. Responses due by 9/24/2021 Replies due by 10/4/2021. Deposition due by 8/27/2021. Discovery due by 8/27/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Ready for Trial by 10/14/2021. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/14/2021) (kv) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#9

(#9) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company..(Duffalo, Jan) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Irwin Lewbel on behalf of Hudson Excess Insurance Company..(Lewbel, Steven) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: 5-14 2021, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:00am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 5/14/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/28/2021) (kv) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Hudson Excess Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/26/2021, answer due 6/25/2021. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company..(Duffalo, Jan) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hudson Excess Insurance Company. (sj) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hudson Excess Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company..(Duffalo, Jan) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Houston Casualty Company. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company..(Duffalo, Jan) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Duffalo, Jan) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 7/12/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 7/12/2021. Motions due by 9/10/2021. Responses due by 9/24/2021 Replies due by 10/4/2021. Deposition due by 8/27/2021. Discovery due by 8/27/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Ready for Trial by 10/14/2021. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/14/2021) (kv) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 5/14/2021, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company..(Duffalo, Jan) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Irwin Lewbel on behalf of Hudson Excess Insurance Company..(Lewbel, Steven) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: 5-14 2021, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:00am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 5/14/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/28/2021) (kv) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Hudson Excess Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/26/2021, answer due 6/25/2021. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company..(Duffalo, Jan) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hudson Excess Insurance Company. (sj) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hudson Excess Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company..(Duffalo, Jan) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Houston Casualty Company. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company..(Duffalo, Jan) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Duffalo, Jan) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint,. Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24390874..(Duffalo, Jan) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hudson Excess Insurance Company. Document filed by Houston Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Complaint in the U/L Action, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Cow Bay's Amended Answer, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Subcontract, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - First Change Order, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Second Change Order, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Hudson Primary Policy, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - Hudson Excess Policy, #8 Exhibit Ex.. H - HCC Policy).(Duffalo, Jan) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hudson Excess Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Houston Casualty Company is a litigant