This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/26/2019 at 07:25:28 (UTC).

Houseman et al v. Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Houseman filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Denise Page Hood and Mona K. Majzoub. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-11915

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise Page Hood

Referral Judge

Mona K. Majzoub

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David H Houseman

Margaret Houseman

Defendant

Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason Benjamin Brown

Attorney at Romano Law PLLC

23880 Woodard Ave.

Pleasant Ridge, MI 48069

Paul F. Doherty

Attorney at Johnson Law, PLC

Buhl Building, 535 Griswold Street, Suite 2632

Detroit, MI 48230

Defendant Attorney

Donald C. Brownell

Attorney at Vandeveer Garzia

840 W. Long Lake Road, Suite 600

Troy, MI 48098-6340

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Majzoub : Settlement Conference to be conducted during the month of December 2019. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/9/2020 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/10/2020 Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2020 02:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Jury Trial set for 6/9/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Refer to image for additional dates) (LSau) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/8/2019) (LSau). (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jason Benjamin Brown appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brown, Jason) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 10:15 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest identifying Corporate Parent Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. for Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Brownell, Donald) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Brownell, Donald) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest and Certificate of Compliance from Wayne Circuit, case number 19-007527-CK. Receipt No: 0645-7302015 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Brownell, Donald) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Majzoub : Settlement Conference to be conducted during the month of December 2019. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/9/2020 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/10/2020 Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2020 02:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Jury Trial set for 6/9/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Refer to image for additional dates) (LSau) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/8/2019) (LSau). (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Scheduling Conference held on 8/8/2019. (LSau) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jason Benjamin Brown appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brown, Jason) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 10:15 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest identifying Corporate Parent Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. for Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Brownell, Donald) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Brownell, Donald) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest and Certificate of Compliance from Wayne Circuit, case number 19-007527-CK. Receipt No: 0645-7302015 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Brownell, Donald) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citizens Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald C. Brownell