This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 13:25:58 (UTC).

Filing Error

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 Filing Error was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-OP-45316

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

Mallinckrodt PLC

Purdue Pharma, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.

TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.;

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis LLC

THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.

ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., f/k/a WATSON PHARMA, INC.

Cephalon, Inc.

ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.;

Cardinal Health Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

ALLERGAN PLC, f/k/a ACTAVIS PLC

Johnson & Johnson

AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Michael J. Fuller, Jr.

Attorney at McHugh Fuller Law Group

97 Elias Whiddon Road

Hattiesburg, MS 39402

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVERSHEET

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9303509.. Filed by Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVERSHEET, #2 Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM) (Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketRemark by Finance. Funds in the amount of $400 refunded on 5/21/2019 for receipt 0647-9303509. (S,NM) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • CASE OPENING ERROR. Duplicate of 1:19op45315. This case will be terminated. (P,R) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: terminated & refiled. Receipt #: 26HC5TPE, filed by Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians. (Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9303509.. Filed by Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVERSHEET, #2 Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM) (Fuller, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLERGAN PLC f/k/a ACTAVIS PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. is a litigant