Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:45:41 (UTC).

Houle et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 Houle filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert D. Mariani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00514

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert D. Mariani

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kelly Reese

Susan Sterner

Brenda Houle

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory G. Paul

Attorney at Morgan & Paul, PLLC

First And Market Building, 100 First Avenue, Suite 1010

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Defendant Attorneys

Constance H Weber

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

707 Virginia Street, East, Suite 1010

Charleston, WV 25301

Scott A Forman

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

333 S.E. 2Nd Avenue, Suite 2700

Miami, FL 33131

Allison R. Brown

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

625 Liberty Ave, 26Th Floor, Eqt Plaza

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (Joint) by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Brown, Allison) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#32

(#32) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #28 MOTION to Stay the Deadlines Set Forth in the Court's Order and Discovery Pending Resolution of its Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Brenda Houle, Kelly Reese, Susan Sterner.(Paul, Gregory) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

31 #3

Exhibit(s) Sterner EEOC Update

31 #2

Exhibit(s) Reese EEOC Update

31 #1

Exhibit(s) Houle EEOC Update

#31

(#31) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Ameded Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Brenda Houle, Kelly Reese, Susan Sterner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Houle EEOC Update, #2 Exhibit(s) Reese EEOC Update, #3 Exhibit(s) Sterner EEOC Update, #4 Exhibit(s) Drogin Report, #5 Exhibit(s) Unpublished Opinions)(Paul, Gregory) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

28 #2

Proposed Order

28 #1

Certificate of Nonconcurrence

#28

(#28) MOTION to Stay the Deadlines Set Forth in the Court's Order and Discovery Pending Resolution of its Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Allison) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

1 #8

Exhibit(s) G

1 #7

Exhibit(s) F

1 #6

Exhibit(s) E

1 #5

Exhibit(s) D

1 #4

Exhibit(s) C

1 #3

Exhibit(s) B

1 #2

Exhibit(s) A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#7) CERTIFICATE of by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. re #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, of Concurrence. (Brown, Allison) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (Joint) by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Brown, Allison) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #28 MOTION to Stay the Deadlines Set Forth in the Court's Order and Discovery Pending Resolution of its Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Brenda Houle, Kelly Reese, Susan Sterner.(Paul, Gregory) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Ameded Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Brenda Houle, Kelly Reese, Susan Sterner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Houle EEOC Update, #2 Exhibit(s) Reese EEOC Update, #3 Exhibit(s) Sterner EEOC Update, #4 Exhibit(s) Drogin Report, #5 Exhibit(s) Unpublished Opinions)(Paul, Gregory) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Ameded Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Brown, Allison) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Renewed re #28 MOTION to Stay the Deadlines Set Forth in the Court's Order and Discovery Pending Resolution of its Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Brown, Allison) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MOTION to Stay the Deadlines Set Forth in the Court's Order and Discovery Pending Resolution of its Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Allison) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Ameded Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Allison) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative and Additional Defenses by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Brown, Allison) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as follows: Defendant may file a brief in support of its Partial Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint which shall not exceed 7,300 words. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 6/25/19 (jam) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation and Word Count Limit by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Allison) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation and Word Count Limitation by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Brown, Allison) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference VIA TELEPHONE set for 7/18/2019 11:00 AM.The placement of the telephone conference call is the responsibility of the plaintiff. The completed Joint Case Management Plan must be filed at least 5 days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 5/21/19. (jam) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. answer due 5/29/2019. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 4/29/19 (jam) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. re #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, of Concurrence. (Brown, Allison) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Allison) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Allison R. Brown on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Brown, Allison) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brenda Houle, Kelly Reese, Susan Sterner. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Paul, Gregory) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/25/19. (jam) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4709043), filed by Brenda Houle, Kelly Reese, Susan Sterner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F, #8 Exhibit(s) G)(bg) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Alan Forman