This case was last updated from PACER on 12/09/2019 at 08:01:10 (UTC).

Houghton v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 Houghton filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00695

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Houghton

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Defendants

Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.

Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Michael McDonald

Attorney at Bateman Law Firm

6700 Jefferson Hwy., Ste Building 3

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

David Bateman

Attorney at Bateman Law Firm

6700 Jefferson Highway, Building 3, 70806

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Defendant Attorneys

Alexis R Jani

Attorney at Boykin and Utley

400 Poydras Street, Suite 1540

New Orleans, LA 70130

Terrill W. Boykin

Attorney at Boykin & Utley

400 Poydras Street, Suite 1540

New Orleans, LA 70130-3225

Kriste Louise Talton Utley

Attorney at Boykin & Utley

400 Poydras Street, Suite 1540, 70130, Suite 1540

New Orleans, LA 70130

Ross Adam Ledet

Attorney at Boykin, Ehret, & Utley

400 Poydras St.

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) STATUS REPORT by Charles Houghton. (Bateman, David) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd..(Jani, Alexis) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition for Damages by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Jani, Alexis) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/11/2019. (ELW) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

2 #1

Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal

#2

(#2) First MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal, #2 Proposed Order)(Jani, Alexis) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

1 #12

Exhibit 9 - Consent

1 #10

Exhibit 7 - Conn. Hartford

1 #9

Exhibit 6 - Conn. Sentinel

1 #8

Exhibit 5 - Notice of Removal

1 #7

Exhibit 4 - Request for Notice

1 #6

Exhibit 3 - Motion for Extension

1 #5

Exhibit 2 - Request for Notice

1 #4

Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages

1 #3

Corporate Disclosure

1 #2

List of Party Pleadings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court for the Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-687333. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2014357), filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 List of Party Pleadings, #3 Corporate Disclosure, #4 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages, #5 Exhibit 2 - Request for Notice, #6 Exhibit 3 - Motion for Extension, #7 Exhibit 4 - Request for Notice, #8 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit 6 - Conn. Sentinel, #10 Exhibit 7 - Conn. Hartford, #11 Exhibit 8 - Ill. Allstate, #12 Exhibit 9 - Consent)(Jani, Alexis) (Attachment 11 replaced on 10/11/2019 to correct page orientation) (KMW). (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/11/2019) (ELW). Modified on 10/11/2019 as granted by rec doc #4 (ELW). (Entered: 10/10/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STATUS REPORT by Charles Houghton. (Bateman, David) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd..(Jani, Alexis) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER denying without prejudice the #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for failure to show good cause or that the requirements of Local Civil Rule 7(a) are met. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition for Damages. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition for Damages by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Jani, Alexis) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/11/2019. (ELW) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #2 First MOTION to Substitute #1 Notice of Removal. The clerk's office is directed to replace R. Doc. 1 with R. Doc. 2-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 First MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (KMW) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) First MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal, #2 Proposed Order)(Jani, Alexis) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court for the Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-687333. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2014357), filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 List of Party Pleadings, #3 Corporate Disclosure, #4 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages, #5 Exhibit 2 - Request for Notice, #6 Exhibit 3 - Motion for Extension, #7 Exhibit 4 - Request for Notice, #8 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit 6 - Conn. Sentinel, #10 Exhibit 7 - Conn. Hartford, #11 Exhibit 8 - Ill. Allstate, #12 Exhibit 9 - Consent)(Jani, Alexis) (Attachment 11 replaced on 10/11/2019 to correct page orientation) (KMW). (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/11/2019) (ELW). Modified on 10/11/2019 as granted by rec doc #4 (ELW). (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.