This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2019 at 07:40:52 (UTC).

Houck v. Saul

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 Houck filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John T. Rodgers and Rosanna Malouf Peterson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03248

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John T. Rodgers

Rosanna Malouf Peterson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tracy K Houck

Defendant

Andrew M Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D James Tree

Attorney at Tree Law Office

3711 Englewood Avenue

Yakima, WA 98902

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy Michael Durkin

Attorney at U S Attorney's Office - SPO

920 W Riverside Suite 300, P O Box 1494

Spokane, WA 99210-1494

Lars Joseph Nelson

Attorney at Office of the General Counsel - SEA

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2900, M/S 221A

Seattle, WA 98104-7075

 

Court Documents

#11

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#10

(#10) ORDER ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; The Report and Recommendation, ECF No. #7 , is adopted in its entirety. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals Tracy's answers to questions three and four of the Application illustrate that she has sufficient funds to pay the filing fee. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee,or this case will be dismissed without prejudice. Case Management Deadline set for 12/22/2019. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (TR, Case Administrator) Modified on 11/22/2019 (MS, Judicial Assistant). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#9

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#6) CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (JW, ECF Admin) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Lars Joseph Nelson on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Lars Joseph Nelson added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Nelson, Lars) (Entered: 12/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; The Report and Recommendation, ECF No. #7 , is adopted in its entirety. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals Tracy's answers to questions three and four of the Application illustrate that she has sufficient funds to pay the filing fee. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee,or this case will be dismissed without prejudice. Case Management Deadline set for 12/22/2019. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (TR, Case Administrator) Modified on 11/22/2019 (MS, Judicial Assistant). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • (#8) Clerk's ORDER OF RANDOM REASSIGNMENT. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by: Tracy K Houck. Objections to R&R due by 11/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (JW, ECF Admin) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy K Houck re Andrew M Saul. (Tree, D) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons US Attorney General)(AN, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by the Case Management Deadline set for 10/28/2019 (AN, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers assigned to case. (AN, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul IFP Pending Filed by Tracy K Houck. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less