This case was last updated from PACER on 03/14/2020 at 07:50:58 (UTC).

Hossele et al v. Progressive Advanced Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 Hossele filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven P Logan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00105

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven P Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kierstin Hossele

Walter Hossele

Defendant

Progressive Advanced Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John David Herbert

Attorney at Herbert & Associates PA

Po Box 9620

Chandler Heights, AZ 85227-9620

Defendant Attorneys

Hesam Alagha

Attorney at Herman Goldstein & Woods

1850 E Thunderbird Rd.

Phoenix, AZ 85022

Evan S Goldstein

Attorney at Herman Goldstein & Woods

1850 E Thunderbird Rd.

Phoenix, AZ 85022

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17835830. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-105-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER: The Stipulation to Dismiss #12 is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/2/2020. (LMR) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Kierstin Hossele. (Herbert, John) Modified filers on 2/10/2020. Document refiled at #9 (SLQ). (Entered: 02/07/2020)

7 #1

Attachments

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Settlement by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. (Alagha, Hesam) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Advanced Insurance Company for Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. (Alagha, Hesam) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MYE) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference is set for 3/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 1/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. (MYE) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#5

(#5) PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 1/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-097640. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17835830 filed by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. (Alagha, Hesam) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MYE) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER: This case will be dismissed with prejudice by the Clerk of Court without further notice on March 20, 2020 unless a stipulation to dismiss or request for reinstatement on the Court's trial calendar is filed prior to the dismissal date. All pending hearings are vacated. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/19/2020. (LMR) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

5 #1

Attachments

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: The Stipulation to Dismiss #12 is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/2/2020. (LMR) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. (Alagha, Hesam) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: This case will be dismissed with prejudice by the Clerk of Court without further notice on March 20, 2020 unless a stipulation to dismiss or request for reinstatement on the Court's trial calendar is filed prior to the dismissal date. All pending hearings are vacated. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/19/2020. (LMR) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Settlement by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. (Alagha, Hesam) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiffs Kierstin Hossele, Walter Hossele. (Duplicate of document #8 , refiled for statistical purposes only). (SLQ) *Note that this document contains the incorrect case number. Modified on 2/10/2020 (SLQ). (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Kierstin Hossele. (Herbert, John) Modified filers on 2/10/2020. Document refiled at #9 (SLQ). (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference is set for 3/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 1/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Advanced Insurance Company for Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. (Alagha, Hesam) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 1/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. (MYE) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MYE) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17835830. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-105-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docket***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED: ANSWER to Complaint by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. ENTERED IN DISTRICT COURT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES***(MYE) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-097640. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17835830 filed by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. (Alagha, Hesam) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MYE) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.