This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2022 at 08:56:30 (UTC).

HOSPITALITY INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al v. LAKE ERIE LODGE, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 HOSPITALITY INTERNATIONAL, INC filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against LAKE ERIE LODGE, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan Paradise Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00305

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan Paradise Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOSPITALITY INTERNATIONAL, INC.

RED CARPET INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Defendants

HASSAN MUHAMMED

LAKE ERIE LODGE, INC.

HARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Evan M. Goldman

Attorney at A.Y. Strauss LLC

101 Eisenhower Parkway, Suite 412

Roseland, NJ 07068

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against LAKE ERIE LODGE, INC., HASSAN "HARRY" MUHAMMED (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6792029), filed by HOSPITALITY INTERNATIONAL, INC., RED CARPET INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to LAKE ERIE LODGE, INC., HASSAN MUHAMMED (Attachments: #1 Summons Muhammed) (elt) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

2 #1

Summons Muhammed

#3

(#3) PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (elt) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement identifying Southern Scottish Inns, Inc. and Red Carpet Inns International, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HOSPITALITY INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Goldman, Evan) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#5

(#5) First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by HOSPITALITY INTERNATIONAL, INC., RED CARPET INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration Declaration of Christopher Guimbellot, #3 Proposed Order Order to Show Cause) (Goldman, Evan) Modified text on 12/16/2021. Removed Brief in Support from public view and filed as a main document at #6 (elt) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

5 #1

*Restricted*

5 #2

Declaration Declaration of Christopher Guimbellot

5 #3

Proposed Order Order to Show Cause

#6

(#6) BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by HOSPITALITY INTERNATIONAL, INC., RED CARPET INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC. Correction: Brief was initially filed as an attachment and not as a Main document. (elt) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by HOSPITALITY INTERNATIONAL, INC., RED CARPET INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. HASSAN MUHAMMED served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Goldman, Evan) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by HOSPITALITY INTERNATIONAL, INC., RED CARPET INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. LAKE ERIE LODGE, INC. served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Goldman, Evan) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by HOSPITALITY INTERNATIONAL, INC., RED CARPET INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. LAKE ERIE LODGE, INC. served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Goldman, Evan) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by HOSPITALITY INTERNATIONAL, INC., RED CARPET INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. HASSAN MUHAMMED served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Goldman, Evan) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by HOSPITALITY INTERNATIONAL, INC., RED CARPET INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC. Correction: Brief was initially filed as an attachment and not as a Main document. (elt) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by HOSPITALITY INTERNATIONAL, INC., RED CARPET INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration Declaration of Christopher Guimbellot, #3 Proposed Order Order to Show Cause) (Goldman, Evan) Modified text on 12/16/2021. Removed Brief in Support from public view and filed as a main document at #6 (elt) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement identifying Southern Scottish Inns, Inc. and Red Carpet Inns International, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HOSPITALITY INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Goldman, Evan) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 11/16/2021. (jv) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (elt) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to LAKE ERIE LODGE, INC., HASSAN MUHAMMED (Attachments: #1 Summons Muhammed) (elt) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against LAKE ERIE LODGE, INC., HASSAN "HARRY" MUHAMMED (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6792029), filed by HOSPITALITY INTERNATIONAL, INC., RED CARPET INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hospitality International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRY DBA: DAN V. AUTO is a litigant