This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2020 at 10:01:37 (UTC).

Hospital Holdings Corporation v. Mayhill Health Care Partners, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 Hospital Holdings Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mayhill Health Care Partners, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01049

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Hospital Holdings Corporation

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Mayhill Health Care Partners, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Rick S. Miller

Attorney at Ferry Joseph, P.A.

824 Market St., Suite 1000, P.O. Box 1351

Wilmington, DE 19899

David J. Ferry, Jr.

Attorney at Ferry Joseph, P.A.

824 Market St., Suite 1000, P.O. Box 1351

Wilmington, DE 19899

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski

Attorney at Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kurt M. Heyman

Attorney at Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Hospital Holdings Corporation.(Miller, Rick) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Select Medical Holdings Corporation for Hospital Holdings Corporation filed by Hospital Holdings Corporation. (Miller, Rick) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski on behalf of Mayhill Health Care Partners, Inc. (Donimirski, Melissa) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Mayhill Health Care Partners, Inc.. (Heyman, Kurt) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Mayhill Health Care Partners, Inc. Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Hospital Holdings Corporation by Mayhill Health Care Partners, Inc..(Heyman, Kurt) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#3

(#3) Return of Service Executed by Hospital Holdings Corporation. Mayhill Health Care Partners, Inc. served on 8/13/2020, answer due 9/3/2020. (Miller, Rick) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE - filed against Mayhill Health Care Partners, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3112605.) - filed by Hospital Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#9) ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than October 15, 2020. The parties are to review the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, Forms). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/1/2020. (ntl) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Hospital Holdings Corporation.(Miller, Rick) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Select Medical Holdings Corporation for Hospital Holdings Corporation filed by Hospital Holdings Corporation. (Miller, Rick) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski on behalf of Mayhill Health Care Partners, Inc. (Donimirski, Melissa) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Mayhill Health Care Partners, Inc.. (Heyman, Kurt) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Mayhill Health Care Partners, Inc. Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Hospital Holdings Corporation by Mayhill Health Care Partners, Inc..(Heyman, Kurt) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Return of Service Executed by Hospital Holdings Corporation. Mayhill Health Care Partners, Inc. served on 8/13/2020, answer due 9/3/2020. (Miller, Rick) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (mal) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE - filed against Mayhill Health Care Partners, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3112605.) - filed by Hospital Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rick S. Miller