This case was last updated from PACER on 10/25/2019 at 07:48:18 (UTC).

Horton v. Madison County Sheriff's Department et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2019 Horton filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Madison County Sheriff's Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and James D. Todd. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01179

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judge

James D. Todd

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larry D. Horton

Jackson, TN 38301

Defendants

State of Tennessee

Madison County Sheriff's Department

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CIVIL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 10/24/19. (ejc) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER DISMISSING AMENDED COMPLAINT, CERTIFYING AN APPEAL WOULD NOT BE TAKEN IN GOOD FAITH AND NOTIFYING PLAINTIFF OF APPELLATE FILING FEE. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 10/22/19. (mbm) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

10 #1

envelope

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Madison County Sheriff's Department, State of Tennessee, filed by Larry D. Horton. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(cdi) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER DENYING #8 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND GRANTING ADDITIONAL TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 9/12/19. (cdi) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

8 #2

envelope

8 #1

trust fund

#8

(#8) MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Larry D. Horton. (Attachments: #1 trust fund, #2 envelope)(skc) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

7 #2

envelope

7 #1

Inmate Request form for Trust Fund

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Filing by Larry D. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Request form for Trust Fund, #2 envelope)(cdi) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER ASSESSING PLAINTIFF HORTON'S PRO RATA FILING FEE OF $116.66 PURSUANT TO PLRA, DISMISSING COMPLAINT AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 8/27/19. (mbm) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RECONSIDER, DIRECTING PLAINTIFF MCCLAIN TO COMPLY WITH 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)-(b), AND SEVERING PLAINTIFF HORTON'S CASE. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 8/26/19. (mbm) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF HORTON LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SEVERING PLAINTIFF PACHECO-LOPEZ'S CASE. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 8/21/19. (mbm) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER TO MODIFY THE DOCKET, GRANTING PLAINTIFF PACHECO-LOPEZ'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, GRANTING PLAINTIFF HORTON ADDITIONAL TIME TO COMPLY, AND DISMISSING ALL OTHER PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 8/7/19. (mbm) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

2 #1

Affidavit

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry D. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(mbm) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

1 #1

signatures

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CIVIL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 10/24/19. (ejc) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER DISMISSING AMENDED COMPLAINT, CERTIFYING AN APPEAL WOULD NOT BE TAKEN IN GOOD FAITH AND NOTIFYING PLAINTIFF OF APPELLATE FILING FEE. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 10/22/19. (mbm) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Madison County Sheriff's Department, State of Tennessee, filed by Larry D. Horton. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(cdi) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER DENYING #8 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND GRANTING ADDITIONAL TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 9/12/19. (cdi) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Larry D. Horton. (Attachments: #1 trust fund, #2 envelope)(skc) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Filing by Larry D. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Request form for Trust Fund, #2 envelope)(cdi) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER ASSESSING PLAINTIFF HORTON'S PRO RATA FILING FEE OF $116.66 PURSUANT TO PLRA, DISMISSING COMPLAINT AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 8/27/19. (mbm) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RECONSIDER, DIRECTING PLAINTIFF MCCLAIN TO COMPLY WITH 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)-(b), AND SEVERING PLAINTIFF HORTON'S CASE. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 8/26/19. (mbm) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF HORTON LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SEVERING PLAINTIFF PACHECO-LOPEZ'S CASE. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 8/21/19. (mbm) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER TO MODIFY THE DOCKET, GRANTING PLAINTIFF PACHECO-LOPEZ'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, GRANTING PLAINTIFF HORTON ADDITIONAL TIME TO COMPLY, AND DISMISSING ALL OTHER PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 8/7/19. (mbm) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry D. Horton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(mbm) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Note to record: Case opened pursuant to 8/26/19 Order, DE# 30 in case 1:18-cv-1241. PRO SE COMPLAINT against Madison County Sheriff's Department, State of Tennessee, filed by Larry D. Horton. (Attachments: #1 signatures, #2 statement of claim cont., #3 envelope, #4 judge's card)(mbm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2019: #5 Magistrate Card) (csf). (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less