0:23-CV-60353
02/23/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Product Liability
Rodney Smith
Sarah Horton
Ford Motor Company
John Sczepanski
William L. Bromagen
Main Document
Exhibit Exhibit A- Amended Complaint
Exhibit Exhibit B- Circuit Court Docket Documents
(#5) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney John Sczepanski, mailing date February 24, 2023, (pt) (Entered: 02/24/2023)
(#6) STRICKEN per DE #13 . NOTICE by Ford Motor Company re 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Bromagen, William) Modified on 3/3/2023 (pcs). (Entered: 02/24/2023)
(#7) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company. (Bromagen, William) (Entered: 02/24/2023)
(#11) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/27/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company (Bromagen, William) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
(#13) NOTICE of Striking #6 Notice (Other) filed by Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company (Bromagen, William) (Entered: 03/02/2023)
(#14) NOTICE by Ford Motor Company re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), (Bromagen, William) (Entered: 03/02/2023)
(#15) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Raag Singhal recused. Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/1/2023. See attached document for full details. (yar) (Entered: 03/02/2023)
(#16) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 3/31/2023 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/3/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
(#17) "STRICKEN" NOTICE by Ford Motor Company Joint Proposed Scheduling Order (Bromagen, William) Modified on 4/21/2023 (ls). (per DE #18) (Entered: 03/20/2023)
Docket(#18) PAPERLESS ORDER STRIKING #17 the parties' Joint Proposed Scheduling Order. The parties have failed to file a Joint Scheduling Report as required by prior Court order and Local Rule 16.1 and the Proposed Scheduling Order does not comply with the Court's order. The parties shall file their Joint Scheduling Report and Proposed Scheduling Order by April 28, 2023. Failure to comply shall result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/21/2023. (cbn) (Entered: 04/21/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#17) "STRICKEN" NOTICE by Ford Motor Company Joint Proposed Scheduling Order (Bromagen, William) Modified on 4/21/2023 (ls). (per DE #18) (Entered: 03/20/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#16) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 3/31/2023 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/3/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#15) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Raag Singhal recused. Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/1/2023. See attached document for full details. (yar) (Entered: 03/02/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#14) NOTICE by Ford Motor Company re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), (Bromagen, William) (Entered: 03/02/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#13) NOTICE of Striking #6 Notice (Other) filed by Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company (Bromagen, William) (Entered: 03/02/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company (Bromagen, William) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/27/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONSWithin SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges as interested parties unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/27/2023. (eca) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions (and responses to motions) with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions (and responses).Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Courts CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket EntryA party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/27/2023. (eca) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) Clerk's Notice to Filer re #6 Notice (Other). Document Not Captioned; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. (ls) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company. (Bromagen, William) (Entered: 02/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) STRICKEN per DE #13 . NOTICE by Ford Motor Company re 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Bromagen, William) Modified on 3/3/2023 (pcs). (Entered: 02/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney John Sczepanski, mailing date February 24, 2023, (pt) (Entered: 02/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Kirsten Leanne Brown has not been added to this case due to her membership status in this Courts Bar #https://www.flsd.uscourts.gov/flsd-bar-admission-status-and-admission-date-look. (pt) (Entered: 02/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. State Court Records attachment #2 not visible. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the State Court Records attached within 24 hours. (aao) (Entered: 02/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (aao) (Entered: 02/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16360357, filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Circuit Court Docket Documents)No Answer/Motion to Dismiss. (Bromagen, William) Modified on 2/24/2023 (aao). (Entered: 02/23/2023)
[-] Read Less