This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/13/2022 at 08:22:36 (UTC).

Horton v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, et al.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 Horton filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Staci M. Yandle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00518

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Staci M. Yandle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JULIA, Individually and as Special Administrator o HORTON

Defendants

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, Successor-by-Merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

ALFA LAVAL INC., as Successor-in-Interest to THE DELAVAL SEPARATOR COMPANY

AR WILFLEY AND SONS, INC.

Armstrong International, Inc.

Atwood & Morrill as Successor-in-Interest to Weir Valves and Controls USA Inc.

Aurora Pump Company

Blackmer Pump Company

BW/IP Inc.

Carrier Corporation including its Bryant Heating and Cooling and its division International Comfort Products

Clark-Reliance Corporation

Cleaver-Brooks, a division of Aqua-Chem Inc.

Copes-Vulcan, Inc.

Crane Co.

Flowserve US, Inc., Solely as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valves, Inc. and Nordstrom Valves, Inc.

FMC Corporation, as Successor-in-Interest to Northern Pumps and on behalf of its former Peerless Pump and Chicago Pump businesses

Foster Wheeler, LLC as survivor to the merger of Foster Wheeler Corporation

Gardner Denver, Inc.

General Electric Company

Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.

35 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Julie Fix Meyer

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP - St. Louis

7700 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Other Attorneys

Undray Wilks

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP - Chicago

110 North Wacker Dr., Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60606

Benjamin R. Schmickle

Attorney at SWMW Law, LLC

701 Market Street, Suite 1000

St. Louis, MO 63101

Stephanie L. Gold

Attorney at SWMW Law, LLC

701 Market Street, Suite 1000

St. Louis, MO 63101

Robert William Stephens

Attorney at Swanson, Martin & Bell, LLP-St. Louis

800 Market Street, Suite 2100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Kelly E. Purkey

Attorney at McKenna Storer

33 North Lasalle Street, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60602-2610

Paul S. Steinhofer

Attorney at McKenna Storer

33 North Lasalle Street, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60602-2610

 

Court Documents

#57

(#57) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Purkey on behalf of Armstrong Pumps, Inc. (Purkey, Kelly) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#56

(#56) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul S. Steinhofer on behalf of Armstrong Pumps, Inc. (Steinhofer, Paul) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#54

(#54) AMENDED COMPLAINT against AR Wilfley and Sons, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Atwood & Morrill, Aurora Pump Company, BW/IP Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Carrier Corporation, Clark-Reliance Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Crane Co., FMC Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., Foster Wheeler, LLC, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., Gorman Rupp Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Greene Tweed & Co., Inc., Grinnell LLC, Honeywell International, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., ITT Corporation, Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Invensys Systems, Inc., James Walker Mfg. Co., John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Lamons, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc., Morse Tec, LLC, Nash Engineering Company, SPX Corporation, Spence Engineering Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corp., ViacomCBS Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., William Powell Company, Yuba Heat Transfer LLC, Zurn Industries, LLC, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Gold, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#51

(#51) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) and/or for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b), #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) and/or for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b), #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pending resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Gold, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#30

(#51) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) and/or for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b), #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) and/or for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b), #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pending resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Gold, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#28

(#51) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) and/or for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b), #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) and/or for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b), #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pending resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Gold, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#25

(#51) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) and/or for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b), #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) and/or for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b), #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pending resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Gold, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#19

(#51) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) and/or for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b), #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) and/or for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b), #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pending resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Gold, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#15

(#51) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) and/or for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b), #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) and/or for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b), #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pending resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Gold, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Imo Industries, Inc.. (Stephens, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Stephens on behalf of Imo Industries, Inc. (Stephens, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by York International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corporation. (Wilks, Undray) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Undray Wilks on behalf of York International Corporation (Wilks, Undray) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit State Court Removal Notice

1 #3

Exhibit State Court Docket Report

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

State Court Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Purkey on behalf of Armstrong Pumps, Inc. (Purkey, Kelly) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul S. Steinhofer on behalf of Armstrong Pumps, Inc. (Steinhofer, Paul) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) ORDER: In light of Plaintiff filing an Amended Complaint (Doc. #54 ), Defendants' motions to dismiss the original complaint (Docs. #15 , #19 , #22 , #23 , #25 , #28 , and #30 ) and Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #51 ) are TERMINATED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/29/2022. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) AMENDED COMPLAINT against AR Wilfley and Sons, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Atwood & Morrill, Aurora Pump Company, BW/IP Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Carrier Corporation, Clark-Reliance Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Crane Co., FMC Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., Foster Wheeler, LLC, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., Gorman Rupp Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Greene Tweed & Co., Inc., Grinnell LLC, Honeywell International, Inc., Howden North America, Inc., ITT Corporation, Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Invensys Systems, Inc., James Walker Mfg. Co., John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Lamons, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc., Morse Tec, LLC, Nash Engineering Company, SPX Corporation, Spence Engineering Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corp., ViacomCBS Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., William Powell Company, Yuba Heat Transfer LLC, Zurn Industries, LLC, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Gold, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER: For good cause shown and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a), Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct the Complaint to Remove York International Corporation (Doc. #50 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file the amended complaint instanter. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/28/2022. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Docket(#52) Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 311, this case is transferred from Judge David W. Dugan and reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle. Any deadlines and schedules previously set shall remain in effect. All future pleadings shall bear the case number 22-518-SMY. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/27/2022. (dkd)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) and/or for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b), #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) and/or for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.P.12(b), #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pending resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Gold, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint to Remove York International Corporation by All Plaintiffs. (Gold, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ORDER denying without prejudice #46 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 4/20/2022. (sth) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand)(Gold, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Undray Wilks on behalf of Carrier Corporation (Wilks, Undray) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Stephens, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Stephens on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Stephens, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Imo Industries, Inc.. (Stephens, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Stephens on behalf of Imo Industries, Inc. (Stephens, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge J. Phil Gilbert recused. Case reassigned to Judge David W. Dugan for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/16/2022. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:22-cv-518-JPG. (kls3) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by York International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corporation. (Wilks, Undray) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Undray Wilks on behalf of York International Corporation (Wilks, Undray) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twentieth Judicial Court St. Clair County, IL, case number 22-LA-0047 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4731563), filed by York International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit State Court Docket Report, #4 Exhibit State Court Removal Notice)(Wilks, Undray) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.R. WILFLEY & SONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Julia is a litigant

Latest cases where FLOWSERVE US, INC. SOLEY AS SUCESSOR TO ALIAS : VOGT VALVE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Alfa Laval Inc. is a litigant