This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/12/2020 at 08:40:55 (UTC).

HORTA v. INDY TRANSPORT, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 HORTA filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against INDY TRANSPORT, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark J. Dinsmore and Sarah Evans Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02659

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Matthew E Horta

MATTHEW E. HORTA

Defendant

Indy Transport, Inc.

One Indiana Square, Suite 3500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron J. Williamson

Attorney at WILLIAMSON CIVIL LAW, LLC

211 N. Pennsylvania Street, Suite 1700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Robert Peter Kondras, Jr.

Attorney at HASSLER KONDRAS MILLER LLP

100 Cherry Street

Terre Haute, IN 47807

Defendant Attorney

Blake J. Burgan

Attorney at TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP (Indianapolis)

One Indiana Square, Suite 3500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/9/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#15

(#15) Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW E. HORTA . (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#13

(#13) Witness List (Preliminary), filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW E. HORTA, Exhibit List (Preliminary), filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW E. HORTA. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW E. HORTA. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#14

(#14) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER - The Court hereby amends its Scheduling Order [Dkt. #11 ] as set forth below (see Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/16/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2020 04:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/10/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Be a Party Plaintiff in FLSA Collective Action by MATTHEW E. HORTA (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by INDY TRANSPORT, INC.. (Burgan, Blake) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#8

(#8) Defendand Indy Transport, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by All Defendants.(Burgan, Blake) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Blake J. Burgan on behalf of Defendant INDY TRANSPORT, INC.. (Burgan, Blake) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to INDY TRANSPORT, INC.. (AKH) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron J. Williamson on behalf of Plaintiff Matthew E Horta. (Williamson, Aaron) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Peter Kondras, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Matthew E Horta. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Proposed Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Indy Transport, Inc., filed by Matthew E Horta. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6224204) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/9/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW E. HORTA . (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Witness List (Preliminary), filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW E. HORTA, Exhibit List (Preliminary), filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW E. HORTA. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW E. HORTA. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER - The Court hereby amends its Scheduling Order [Dkt. #11 ] as set forth below (see Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/16/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2020 04:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/10/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Filing Consent to Be a Party Plaintiff in FLSA Collective Action by MATTHEW E. HORTA (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by INDY TRANSPORT, INC.. (Burgan, Blake) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendand Indy Transport, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by All Defendants.(Burgan, Blake) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Blake J. Burgan on behalf of Defendant INDY TRANSPORT, INC.. (Burgan, Blake) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service, filed by MATTHEW E. HORTA. INDY TRANSPORT, INC. served on 10/16/2020. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to INDY TRANSPORT, INC.. (AKH) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron J. Williamson on behalf of Plaintiff Matthew E Horta. (Williamson, Aaron) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Peter Kondras, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Matthew E Horta. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Indy Transport, Inc., filed by Matthew E Horta. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6224204) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less