This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2021 at 07:46:29 (UTC).

Horta Suarez v. IBM et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 Horta Suarez filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against IBM. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Darrin P. Gayles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-23296

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Darrin P. Gayles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joel A. Horta Suarez

Miami, FL 33134

Defendants

IBM

University of Miami

Bloomberg Inc.

Bloomberg Lp

Capital One

Twitter

EFinancial Careers

Job Search Digest

The Ladders

BTIG

JP Morgan Chase

Bank Of America

Morgan Stanley

Goldman Sachs

Credit Suisse

UBS

Citibank

Citigroup

USAJOBS

48 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Waiver of the Service of Summons (blank) by Joel A. Horta Suarez. (scn) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Request to United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida to Allow the Use of the Clerk Office and Court Facilities for the Service of Multiple Parties Defendants to the Action for Reason of Impracticality in Action for Relief from Employment Discrimination against Multiple Parties (Defendants) by Joel A. Horta Suarez. Responses due by 10/5/2021. (scn) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Joel A. Horta Suarez to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: hortasuarezjoela@gmail.com (scn) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice to United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida of Pending, Refiled, Related Litigation Cases to Action for Relief from Employment Discrimination against Multiple Parties (Defendants)filed by Joel A. Horta Suarez. (drz) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joel A. Horta Suarez. (drz) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT in Action For Relief From Employment Discrimination Under US Civil Rights Act and Laws(42U.S.C.) against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Joel A. Horta Suarez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(drz) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U B S L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where BTIG, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ladders, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bloomberg is a litigant