This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2021 at 08:11:56 (UTC).

Horowitz v. Inotiv, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 Horowitz filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Inotiv, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric N. Vitaliano and Peggy Kuo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05858

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric N. Vitaliano

Referral Judge

Peggy Kuo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lee Horowitz

Defendants

Inotiv, Inc.

Robert Leasure, Jr.

Gregory C. Davis

Richard A. Johnson

R. Matthew Neff

John E. Sagartz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Sadeh

Attorney at Halper Sadeh LLP

667 Madison Avenueste 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10065

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lee Horowitz (Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE Of Voluntary Dismissal: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Lee Horowitz hereby voluntarily dismisses the above-captioned action. SO Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 12/17/2021. (Tavarez, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE Of Voluntary Dismissal: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Lee Horowitz hereby voluntarily dismisses the above-captioned action. SO Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 12/17/2021. (Tavarez, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: In light of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed at #6 , the initial conference scheduled for January 21, 2022 is canceled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/16/2021. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lee Horowitz (Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held by telephone in this case on January 21, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.) Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By January 14, 2022, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that Defendants are aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/21/2021. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Gregory C. Davis, Inotiv, Inc., Richard A. Johnson, Robert Leasure, Jr., R. Matthew Neff, John E. Sagartz filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14953124 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Lee Horowitz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Sadeh