This case was last updated from PACER on 04/11/2020 at 08:31:51 (UTC).

Hornsby v. Senior Care Associates, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 Hornsby filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Senior Care Associates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Curtis L Collier and Christopher H Steger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Curtis L Collier

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deborah Hornsby

Defendants

Independant Healthcare Properties, LLC

Senior Care Associates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Baker Gerwig, IV

Attorney at Massey & Associates, PC

6400 Lee Highway, Suite 101

Chattanooga, TN 37421

Defendant Attorney

Scott E Simmons

Attorney at Miller & Martin, PLLC (Chattanooga)

832 Georgia Avenue, 1200 Volunteer Building

Chattanooga, TN 37402

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Summons Issued as to Senior Care Associates, LLC. (AML) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

15 #1

Summons

#15

(#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Deborah Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Gerwig, William) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

13 #1

Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint

#13

(#13) First MOTION to Amend/Revise #8 Notice (Other) Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint by Deborah Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Gerwig, William) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/20/20. (JBR) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Ext Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Deborah Hornsby. (Gerwig, William) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER OF RECUSAL.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 02/13/2020. (KRS) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Independant Healthcare Properties, LLC. (Simmons, Scott) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

8 #2

Exhibit (B) Notice of Filing

8 #1

Exhibit (A) The Complaint

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Independant Healthcare Properties, LLC Corrected Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (A) The Complaint, #2 Exhibit (B) Notice of Filing)(Simmons, Scott) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#7

(#7) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Independant Healthcare Properties, LLC. (Simmons, Scott) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/12/2020. (AML) Mailed to Attorney Gerwig (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/12/2020. (AML) Mailed to Attorney Gerwig (Entered: 02/12/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit (B) Notice of Filing

1 #1

Exhibit (A) The Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Circuit Court, case number 20-0033. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4229053), filed by Independant Healthcare Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (A) The Complaint, #2 Exhibit (B) Notice of Filing)(Simmons, Scott) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Summons Issued as to Senior Care Associates, LLC. (AML) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Deborah Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Gerwig, William) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Amend her complaint. Plaintiff shall electronically file her amended complaint within seven business days of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 3-6-2020. This entry is the Order of the Court. There is no document attached. (KMG) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) First MOTION to Amend/Revise #8 Notice (Other) Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint by Deborah Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Gerwig, William) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/20/20. (JBR) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Ext Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Deborah Hornsby. (Gerwig, William) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF RECUSAL.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 02/13/2020. (KRS) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Independant Healthcare Properties, LLC. (Simmons, Scott) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Independant Healthcare Properties, LLC Corrected Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (A) The Complaint, #2 Exhibit (B) Notice of Filing)(Simmons, Scott) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Independant Healthcare Properties, LLC. (Simmons, Scott) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/12/2020. (AML) Mailed to Attorney Gerwig (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/12/2020. (AML) Mailed to Attorney Gerwig (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/12/2020. (AML) Mailed to Attorney Gerwig (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Administrative Notice to Attorney William Gerwig re: failure to register for e-filing: requirements due by 2/18/2020. (AML) Mailed to Attorney Gerwig (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Administrative Notice to Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal : Missing Civil Cover Sheet - requirements due by 2/18/2020. (AML) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Independant Healthcare Properties, LLC. (AML) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AML) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Circuit Court, case number 20-0033. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4229053), filed by Independant Healthcare Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (A) The Complaint, #2 Exhibit (B) Notice of Filing)(Simmons, Scott) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott E Simmons