Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:51:00 (UTC).

HORNBY v. 3M COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 HORNBY filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00771

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUENTIN HORNBY

Defendants

AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC

3M COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason Ruskin Reese

Attorney at WAGNER REESE, LLP

11939 North Meridian St. #100

Carmel, IN 46032

Timothy Loren Karns

Attorney at WAGNER REESE, LLP

11939 North Meridian St. #100

Carmel, IN 46032

Stephen M. Wagner

Attorney at WAGNER REESE, LLP

11939 North Meridian St. #100

Carmel, IN 46032

ERIN J ROGIERS

Attorney at WATTS GUERRA LLP - SAN ANTONIO TX

4 Dominion Drive, Building 3 Suite 100

San Antonio, TX 78257

MIKAL WATTS

Attorney at WATTS GUERRA LLP - SAN ANTONIO TX

4 Dominion Drive, Building 3 Suite 100

San Antonio, TX 78257

Defendant Attorneys

Alexandria Hanauer Pittman

Attorney at ICE MILLER LLP (Indianapolis)

One American Square, Suite 2900

Indianapolis, IN 46282

Adam Arceneaux

Attorney at ICE MILLER LLP (Indianapolis)

One American Square, Suite 2900

Indianapolis, IN 46282

Renee J. Mortimer

Attorney at LEWIS, BRISBOIS, BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

222 Indianapolis Blvd., Suite 207-5

Schererville, IN 46375

Scott B. Cockrum

Attorney at LEWIS, BRISBOIS, BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

222 Indianapolis Blvd., Suite 207-5

Schererville, IN 46375

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN J ROGIERS on behalf of QUENTIN HORNBY (ROGIERS, ERIN) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of QUENTIN HORNBY (WATTS, MIKAL) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

14 #1

*Restricted*

#14

(#14) Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01095. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#13

(#13) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Florida. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Florida, IN RE: MDL 2885 on April 17, 2019. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#12

(#12) CLOSED TRANSFER to the Northern District of Florida IN RE: 3M COMBAT ARMS EARPLUG PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL. 2885 per CTO 2. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Arceneaux, Adam) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant 3M COMPANY. (Mortimer, Renee) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#9

(#9) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria Hanauer Pittman on behalf of Defendant AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Pittman, Alexandria) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#7

(#7) CONSENT to Removal by AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Arceneaux, Adam) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC identifying Corporate Parent 3M COMPANY for AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC.. (Arceneaux, Adam) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Arceneaux on behalf of Defendant AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Arceneaux, Adam) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott B. Cockrum on behalf of Defendant 3M COMPANY. (Cockrum, Scott) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M COMPANY. (Mortimer, Renee) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Renee J. Mortimer on behalf of Defendant 3M COMPANY. (Mortimer, Renee) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Record (Docket Sheet, Appearance, Complaint, Summons to

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court, Civil Division 10, case number 49D10-1902-CT-006270, filed by 3M COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5341758) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record (Docket Sheet, Appearance, Complaint, Summons to 3M, Summons to Aearo, Notice on Order of Consolidation, Service as to Summons to 3M, Service as to Summons to Aero, Appearance, Appearance, Motion for Enlargement, Motion to Deem, Order on Consolidated Cases, Appearance, Motion for Enlargement, Motion to Deem, Appearance, Order Granting Motion to Deem, Order Granting Motion for Enlargement), #2 Exhibit 2 - Operative Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortimer, Renee) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN J ROGIERS on behalf of QUENTIN HORNBY (ROGIERS, ERIN) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of QUENTIN HORNBY (WATTS, MIKAL) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01095. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Florida. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Florida, IN RE: MDL 2885 on April 17, 2019. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CLOSED TRANSFER to the Northern District of Florida IN RE: 3M COMBAT ARMS EARPLUG PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL. 2885 per CTO 2. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Arceneaux, Adam) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant 3M COMPANY. (Mortimer, Renee) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria Hanauer Pittman on behalf of Defendant AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Pittman, Alexandria) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT to Removal by AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Arceneaux, Adam) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC identifying Corporate Parent 3M COMPANY for AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC.. (Arceneaux, Adam) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Arceneaux on behalf of Defendant AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Arceneaux, Adam) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott B. Cockrum on behalf of Defendant 3M COMPANY. (Cockrum, Scott) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M COMPANY. (Mortimer, Renee) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Renee J. Mortimer on behalf of Defendant 3M COMPANY. (Mortimer, Renee) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court, Civil Division 10, case number 49D10-1902-CT-006270, filed by 3M COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5341758) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record (Docket Sheet, Appearance, Complaint, Summons to 3M, Summons to Aearo, Notice on Order of Consolidation, Service as to Summons to 3M, Service as to Summons to Aero, Appearance, Appearance, Motion for Enlargement, Motion to Deem, Order on Consolidated Cases, Appearance, Motion for Enlargement, Motion to Deem, Appearance, Order Granting Motion to Deem, Order Granting Motion for Enlargement), #2 Exhibit 2 - Operative Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortimer, Renee) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 4/18/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where 3M COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Loren Karns

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M Wagner