This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2022 at 08:37:47 (UTC).

Horn v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, Pa.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Horn filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, Pa. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert H. Cleland and Jonathan J.C. Grey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-12737

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert H. Cleland

Referral Judge

Jonathan J.C. Grey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Douglas Horn

Defendant

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, Pa.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabethann B. Cochran

Attorney at Cochran, Kroll & Associates, PC

32398 Five Mile Road

Livonia, MI 48154

Rula Aoun

Attorney at Cochran, Kroll & Associates PC

32398 Five Mile Rd

Livonia, MI 48154

Terry L. Cochran

Attorney at Cochran Kroll & Associates, P.C.

15510 Farmington Road

Livonia, MI 48154

Defendant Attorney

Kevin J. Plagens

Attorney at Kopka, Pinkus, Dolin & Eads

33533 W. Twelve Mile Roadsuite 350

Farmington Hills, MI 48331

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, Pa. from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 20-004825-NF. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8701778 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit B Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C Plaintiff's Motion to File Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit D Order dated 11/19/21) (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

1 #2

Exhibit A Plaintiff's Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit B Plaintiff's Amended Complaint

1 #4

Exhibit C Plaintiff's Motion to File Amended Complaint

1 #5

Exhibit D Order dated 11/19/21

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Answer to Amended Complaint and Reliance on Jury Demand by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, Pa.. (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#4

(#4) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Aoun, Rula) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Terry L. Cochran on behalf of Anthony Douglas Horn. (Cochran, Terry) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Rula Aoun on behalf of Anthony Douglas Horn. (Aoun, Rula) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/1/2022 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/1/2022 Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2022 02:00 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland Jury Trial set for 1/3/2023 09:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (Refer to image for additional dates) (LWag) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#8

(#8) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, Pa. (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, Pa. (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/1/2022 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/1/2022 Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2022 02:00 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland Jury Trial set for 1/3/2023 09:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (Refer to image for additional dates) (LWag) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Rula Aoun on behalf of Anthony Douglas Horn. (Aoun, Rula) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Terry L. Cochran on behalf of Anthony Douglas Horn. (Cochran, Terry) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for telephonic proceedings before District Judge Robert H. Cleland: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/4/2022 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (LWag) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Aoun, Rula) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Answer to Amended Complaint and Reliance on Jury Demand by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, Pa.. (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, Pa. from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 20-004825-NF. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8701778 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit B Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C Plaintiff's Motion to File Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit D Order dated 11/19/21) (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin J. Plagens