This case was last updated from PACER on 12/29/2019 at 09:22:40 (UTC).

Horman v. Lawrence

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 Horman filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Lawrence. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colin Stirling Bruce. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03255

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colin Stirling Bruce

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Willliam Horman

Menard, IL 62259

William Horman

Sumner, IL 62466

Respondent

Frank Lawrence

Not Yet Classified

Habeas Attorney General

 

Court Documents

10 #3

Exhibits Part 2

#9

(#9) Letter from Petitioner re Conflict of Interest on Appellate Case. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#2

(#2) Letter to Court from Petitioner. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Attached Documents) (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner William Horman. Responses due by 1/10/2020. (KM, ilcd) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

10 #2

Exhibits Part 1

2 #2

Attached Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Change of Address by William Horman from Menard CC to Lawrence CC. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Request Counsel by Petitioner Willliam Horman. Responses due by 12/10/2019. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

2 #1

Cover Letter

10 #5

Envelope

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Willliam Horman.(ME, ilcd) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to File Amended 2254 Petition by Petitioner William Horman. Responses due by 1/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Amended 2254 Petition, #2 Exhibits Part 1, #3 Exhibits Part 2, #4 Exhibits Part 3, #5 Envelope) (KM, ilcd) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Petitioner Willliam Horman. Responses due by 12/10/2019. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/6/2019. Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time, which is construed as a Motion for Leave to Amend #3 is GRANTED. Petitioner's amended petition is due within 30 days of the entry of this order. Petitioner's Motion to Request Counsel #4 is DENIED. Petitioner's $5.00 filing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis is due within 30 days of the entry of this order. See written Order. (Amended Pleadings due by 1/6/2020; Prisoner Prepayment due by 1/6/2020)(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

10 #4

Exhibits Part 3

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner William Horman. Responses due by 1/10/2020. (KM, ilcd) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to File Amended 2254 Petition by Petitioner William Horman. Responses due by 1/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Amended 2254 Petition, #2 Exhibits Part 1, #3 Exhibits Part 2, #4 Exhibits Part 3, #5 Envelope) (KM, ilcd) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/27/19. Petitioner does not appear to have the financial means to pay the filing fee. Thus, Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #8 is GRANTED. (KM, ilcd) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Letter from Petitioner re Conflict of Interest on Appellate Case. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner William Horman. Responses due by 1/3/2020. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Change of Address by William Horman from Menard CC to Lawrence CC. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/6/2019. Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time, which is construed as a Motion for Leave to Amend #3 is GRANTED. Petitioner's amended petition is due within 30 days of the entry of this order. Petitioner's Motion to Request Counsel #4 is DENIED. Petitioner's $5.00 filing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis is due within 30 days of the entry of this order. See written Order. (Amended Pleadings due by 1/6/2020; Prisoner Prepayment due by 1/6/2020)(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Willliam Horman. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Request Counsel by Petitioner Willliam Horman. Responses due by 12/10/2019. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Petitioner Willliam Horman. Responses due by 12/10/2019. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter to Court from Petitioner. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Attached Documents) (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce directing the Petitionerto pay the filing fee of $5.00 within 30 days of this Order. If Petitioner is unable to pay the required filing fee, he may file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to pay the required filing fee or file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis within 30 days, his Petition under 28 U.S.C. ' 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in State Custody #1 will be dismissed without prejudice by this court. Entered on 10/31/2019. (ME, ilcd) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Willliam Horman.(ME, ilcd) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.