This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/05/2022 at 12:28:45 (UTC).

Horizon Personnel Services Inc et al v. The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 Horizon Personnel Services Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-02005

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Horizon Personnel Services Inc

Staffchex Inc

Stay Safe Staffing Inc

Staffchex Management Inc

Defendants

Hartford Financial Services Group Inc

Hartford Fire Insurance Co Inc

Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company

Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd

Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company

Property/Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford

Hartford Insurance Company of Midwest Inc

1-50 DOES

The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.

Hartford Fire Insurance Company

Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company

Hartford Insurance Company of The Midwest

Does 1 through 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bryan S Doss

Attorney at Doss Legal Services

355 South Grand Avenue Suite 2450

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John Douglas Mendonza

Attorney at Doss Legal Services

355 South Grand Avenue Suite 2450

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

Shannon L. Santos

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2407

David Simantob

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Paul S. White

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker LLP

555 South Grand Avenue Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss #12 #13 by Judge James V. Selna: Plaintiffs Horizon Personnel Services, Inc., Staffchex, Inc., Stay Safe Staffing, Inc., and StaffChex Management, Inc. (collectively, "Plaintiffs") filed a first amended complaint ("FAC"). FAC. Dkt. No. #15 . Accordingly, the Court DENIES both motions to dismiss as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. The Court finds that oral argument would not be helpful in this matter. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Hearing set for February 14, 2022 is VACATED. Denying #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case; Denying #13 MOTION to Dismiss. (es) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#15

(#15) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE CO., INC.,; HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY; SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY, LTD.; HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY; PROPERTY/ CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD; and HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF MIDWEST, INC. Does, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of The Midwest, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Property/Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd amending Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by Horizon Personnel Services, Inc., Staffchex, Inc., Stay Safe Staffing, Inc., and StaffChex Management, Inc. Stay Safe Staffing Inc, Staffchex Inc, Horizon Personnel Services Inc, Staffchex Management Inc(Doss, Bryan) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

14 #2

Exhibit A - HFSG SEC Form 10-K (2 of 2)

14 #1

Exhibit A - HFSG SEC Form 10-K (1 of 2)

14 #14

Main Document

13 #3

Exhibit 2 - Complaint (2 of 2)

13 #2

Exhibit 1 - Complaint (1 of 2)

13 #1

Notice

13 #13

Main Document

12 #3

Exhibit 2 - Complaint (2 of 2)

12 #2

Exhibit 1 - Complaint (1 of 2)

12 #1

Notice

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 2/28/2022 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 2/22/2022. (lb) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of The Midwest, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Property/Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 served on Defendants. (Santos, Shannon) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#7

(#7) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss #12 #13 by Judge James V. Selna: Plaintiffs Horizon Personnel Services, Inc., Staffchex, Inc., Stay Safe Staffing, Inc., and StaffChex Management, Inc. (collectively, "Plaintiffs") filed a first amended complaint ("FAC"). FAC. Dkt. No. #15 . Accordingly, the Court DENIES both motions to dismiss as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. The Court finds that oral argument would not be helpful in this matter. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Hearing set for February 14, 2022 is VACATED. Denying #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case; Denying #13 MOTION to Dismiss. (es) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE CO., INC.,; HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY; SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY, LTD.; HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY; PROPERTY/ CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD; and HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF MIDWEST, INC. Does, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of The Midwest, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Property/Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd amending Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by Horizon Personnel Services, Inc., Staffchex, Inc., Stay Safe Staffing, Inc., and StaffChex Management, Inc. Stay Safe Staffing Inc, Staffchex Inc, Horizon Personnel Services Inc, Staffchex Management Inc(Doss, Bryan) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant All Plaintiffs Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Specially Appearing Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of #13 filed by Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - HFSG SEC Form 10-K (1 of 2), #2 Exhibit A - HFSG SEC Form 10-K (2 of 2))(Santos, Shannon) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant All Plaintiffs Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Specially Appearing Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Quash Service of Summons filed by Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint (1 of 2), #3 Exhibit 2 - Complaint (2 of 2)) (Santos, Shannon) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case For Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Defendants Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of The Midwest, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Property/Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint (1 of 2), #3 Exhibit 2 - Complaint (2 of 2)) (Santos, Shannon) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 2/28/2022 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 2/22/2022. (lb) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of The Midwest, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Property/Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 served on Defendants. (Santos, Shannon) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John Douglas Mendonza counsel for Plaintiffs Horizon Personnel Services Inc, Staffchex Inc, Staffchex Management Inc, Stay Safe Staffing Inc. Adding John Mendonza as counsel of record for Horizon Personnel Services, Inc., Staffchex, Inc., Stay Safe Staffing, Inc., Staffchex Management, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Horizon Personnel Services, Inc., Staffchex, Inc., Stay Safe Staffing, Inc., Staffchex Management, Inc.. (Attorney John Douglas Mendonza added to party Horizon Personnel Services Inc(pty:pla), Attorney John Douglas Mendonza added to party Staffchex Inc(pty:pla), Attorney John Douglas Mendonza added to party Staffchex Management Inc(pty:pla), Attorney John Douglas Mendonza added to party Stay Safe Staffing Inc(pty:pla))(Mendonza, John) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hartford Fire Insurance Company answer now due 1/13/2022; Hartford Insurance Company of The Midwest answer now due 1/13/2022; Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company answer now due 1/13/2022; Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company answer now due 1/13/2022; Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd answer now due 1/13/2022; Property/Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford answer now due 1/13/2022; The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. answer now due 1/13/2022, re Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Defendants Hartford Fire Insurance Company; Hartford Insurance Company of The Midwest; Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company; Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company; Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd; Property/Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford.(Santos, Shannon) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of The Midwest, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Property/Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Stay Safe Staffing Inc, Staffchex Inc, Horizon Personnel Services Inc, Staffchex Management Inc. Filed in State Court on 11/2/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEFENDANTS' NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Financial Services Group Inc, Hartford Fire Insurance Co Inc, Hartford Insurance Company of Midwest Inc, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Property/Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd, identifying Plaintiff Horizon Personnel Services, Inc.; Plaintiff Staffchex, Inc.; Plaintiff Stay Safe Staffing, Inc.; Plaintiff Staffchex Management, Inc.; Defendant Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company; Defendant Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company; Defendant Hartford Fire Insurance Company; Defendant Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.; Defendant Property/Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford; Defendant Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest; Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Santos, Shannon) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Financial Services Group Inc, Hartford Fire Insurance Co Inc, Hartford Insurance Company of Midwest Inc, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Property/Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd. (Santos, Shannon) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2021-01229234 Receipt No: ACACDC-32441611 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Hartford Fire Insurance Co Inc, Hartford Insurance Company of Midwest Inc, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd, Property/Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Hartford Financial Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (1 of 2), #2 Exhibit 1 (2 of 2), #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Shannon L. Santos added to party Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon L. Santos added to party Hartford Financial Services Group Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon L. Santos added to party Hartford Fire Insurance Co Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon L. Santos added to party Hartford Insurance Company of Midwest Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon L. Santos added to party Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon L. Santos added to party Property/Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon L. Santos added to party Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd(pty:dft))(Santos, Shannon) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAY SAFE STAFFINGINC is a litigant

Latest cases where StaffChex Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant