This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2022 at 08:12:29 (UTC).

Horizon Medicines LLC et al v. Apotex Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 Horizon Medicines LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Apotex Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher J. Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00640

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher J. Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Horizon Medicines LLC

Horizon Therapeutics Ireland DAC

HZNP Medicines LLC

HZNP Finance LTD.

Counter Claimants and Defendants

Apotex Inc.

Apotex Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Karen Elizabeth Keller

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Andrew Russell

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market St., 12Th Floor, I. M. Pei Building

Wilmington, DE 19801

Douglas W. Cheek

Emily DiBenedetto

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 N Market St, Ste 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Erin C. Trenda

Jonathan R. Davies

Mazda Antia

Nathan Roger Hoeschen

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Sanya Sukduang

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Cortlan S. Hitch

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Ave, Ste 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Deepro R. Mukerjee

Joseph M. Janusz

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

Lance A. Soderstrom

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) MOTION re Joint Motion for a Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute re 44 Order Setting Teleconference,,,,,,, - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#46

(#46) REDACTED VERSION of #33 Declaration of Joseph M. Janusz in support of Apotex's Motion for Summary Judgment by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#45

(#45) REDACTED VERSION of #32 Opening Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#43

(#43) Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Cortlan S. Hitch regarding request for the scheduling of a discovery teleconference. (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#42

(#42) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Apotex to file redacted version of Opening Brief and related Declaration in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment to July 6, 2022 - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#41

(#41) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Apotex's response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (No. 1) filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc..(Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#40

(#40) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/1/2022. (dlb) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#33

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#32

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MOTION re Joint Motion for a Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute re 44 Order Setting Teleconference,,,,,,, - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) REDACTED VERSION of #33 Declaration of Joseph M. Janusz in support of Apotex's Motion for Summary Judgment by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) REDACTED VERSION of #32 Opening Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Docket(#44) ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: The Court has reviewed the parties' July 5, 2022 letter requesting a discovery dispute teleconference regarding one discovery dispute. (D.I. 43) It hereby ORDERS as follows with regard to this dispute: (1) The parties shall file a joint "Motion for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute," the text of which can be found in the "Forms" tab of Judge Burke's page on the District Court's website.; (2) A discovery dispute teleconference is set for 7/25/2022 at 03:30 PM before Judge Christopher J. Burke.; (3) By July 12, 2022, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) single-spaced pages, in no less than 12-point font, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. By July 19, 2022, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) single-spaced pages, in no less than 12-point font, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition.; (4) The parties should also consult and follow Judge Burke's "Guidelines for Discovery Disputes," which is found in the "Guidelines" tab on Judge Burke's portion of the District Court's website.; (5) By no later than July 19, 2022, the parties shall jointly provide the Court's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Benyo, with a dial-in number via e-mail to use for the call.; and (6) The Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the teleconference (however, if any party advises the Court in advance that a newer attorney will argue the dispute, see Standing Order Regarding Courtroom Opportunities for Newer Attorneys, https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/StandingOrder2017.pdf, then the Court will go forward with the conference). Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/5/22. (mlc) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Cortlan S. Hitch regarding request for the scheduling of a discovery teleconference. (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED D.I. #42 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Apotex to file redacted version of Opening Brief and related Declaration in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment to July 6, 2022 filed by Apotex Inc., Apotex Corp. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/5/2022. (mlc) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Apotex to file redacted version of Opening Brief and related Declaration in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment to July 6, 2022 - filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc.. (Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Apotex's response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (No. 1) filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc..(Hitch, Cortlan) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/1/2022. (dlb) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Protective Order by HZNP Finance LTD., HZNP Medicines LLC, Horizon Medicines LLC, Horizon Therapeutics Ireland DAC. (Hoeschen, Nathan) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) [SEALED] MOTION to Expedite Proceedings and Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 - filed by HZNP Finance LTD., HZNP Medicines LLC, Horizon Medicines LLC, Horizon Therapeutics Ireland DAC. (Hoeschen, Nathan) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) [SEALED] DECLARATION re #8 Opening Brief in Support,, [Declaration of Elizabeth Gutierrez] by HZNP Finance LTD., HZNP Medicines LLC, Horizon Medicines LLC, Horizon Therapeutics Ireland DAC. (Hoeschen, Nathan) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 filed by HZNP Finance LTD., HZNP Medicines LLC, Horizon Medicines LLC, Horizon Therapeutics Ireland DAC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Hoeschen, Nathan) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 - filed by HZNP Finance LTD., HZNP Medicines LLC, Horizon Medicines LLC, Horizon Therapeutics Ireland DAC. (Hoeschen, Nathan) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Horizon Therapeutics Ireland DAC, Horizon Medicines LLC, HZNP Medicines LLC, HZNP Finance LTD.. Apotex Corp. served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022; Apotex Inc. served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Apotex Corp. on 5/16/2022; Apotex Inc. on 5/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued)(smg) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Horizon Therapeutics Plc for HZNP Finance LTD., HZNP Medicines LLC, Horizon Medicines LLC, Horizon Therapeutics Ireland DAC filed by HZNP Finance LTD., HZNP Medicines LLC, Horizon Medicines LLC, Horizon Therapeutics Ireland DAC. (smg) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number US 9,066,913 B2. (smg) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3873621.) - filed by Horizon Therapeutics Ireland DAC, Horizon Medicines LLC, HZNP Medicines LLC, HZNP Finance LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON MEDICINES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Apotex Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cortlan S. Hitch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph M. Janusz, Esq.