This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/21/2021 at 09:20:01 (UTC).

Hoquet v. Director, Kentucky Consular Center et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 Hoquet filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Director, Kentucky Consular Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Raag Singhal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-81788

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raag Singhal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Hoquet

Defendants

Director, Kentucky Consular Center

U.S. Department of State

Field Office Director, West Palm Beach Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark Andrew Prada

Attorney at Prada Urizar, PLLC

3191 Coral Way, Suite 500

Miami, FL 33145

Anthony Richard Dominguez

Attorney at Prada Urizar, PLLC

3191 Coral Waysuite 500

Miami, FL 33145

Defendant Attorney

Noticing INS Attorney

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE Closing Case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE Closing Case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal following approval of I-485 application by David Hoquet (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - I-485 Approval Letter) (Dominguez, Anthony) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/23/2021. (jhy) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Director, Kentucky Consular Center, Field Office Director, West Palm Beach Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pcs) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Director, Kentucky Consular Center, Field Office Director, USCIS West Palm Beach Field Office, U.S. Department of State. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15034066, filed by David Hoquet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Appendix of Supporting Documents, #4 Exhibit B - Gomez v. Biden (D.D.C. Aug. 17, 2021), #5 Exhibit C - Goh v. DOS (D.D.C. Sept. 9, 2021), #6 Exhibit D - GAO Report on USCIS)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Dominguez, Anthony) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Department of State is a litigant