This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2020 at 13:58:09 (UTC).

Hopkins v. McCormack Baron Management, Inc. d/b/a McCormack Baron Management et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Hopkins filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against McCormack Baron Management, Inc d/b/a McCormack Baron Management. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ruth Miller and Curtis V. Gomez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00001

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ruth Miller

Presiding Judge

Curtis V. Gomez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Heather Hopkins

St. Thomas, VI 00803

Deosha Hopkins

Defendants

McCormack Baron Management, Inc. d/b/a McCormack Baron Management

720 Olive Street, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63101

Neosha Hopkins

St. Thomas, VI 00803

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETER JAMES LYNCH

Attorney at LYNCH LAW OFFICE

P. O. Box 308351

St. Thomas, VI 00803

Defendant Attorneys

Michael A Rogers

Attorney at Beckstedt & Associates

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820

Carl A Beckstedt, III

Attorney at Beckstedt and Associate

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820-4604

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER

#12

#11

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

#6

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

#4

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosure by Deosha Hopkins, Heather Hopkins (LYNCH, PETER) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by McCormack Baron Management, Inc. d/b/a McCormack Baron Management (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendant McCormack Baron Management, Inc. d/b/a McCormack Baron Management (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF FILING JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Deosha Hopkins, Heather Hopkins (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER) (LYNCH, PETER) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Opposition to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiffs Deosha Hopkins, Heather Hopkins. (LYNCH, PETER) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Deosha Hopkins, Heather Hopkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (LYNCH, PETER) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER (RM) setting Rule 16 Conference in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO REVIEW THE ORDER IN DETAIL AND COMPLY WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS.) (AO) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by McCormack Baron Management, Inc. d/b/a McCormack Baron Management. (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 2/18/2019) by Defendant McCormack Baron Management, Inc. d/b/a McCormack Baron Management. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by PETER JAMES LYNCH on behalf of Plaintiffs Deosha Hopkins, Heather Hopkins (LYNCH, PETER) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Defendant McCormack Baron Management, Inc. d/b/a McCormack Baron Management. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER (GWC) dated 1/9/2019 granting #3 Motion to Change Venue (KMD) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Change Venue by Defendant McCormack Baron Management, Inc. d/b/a McCormack Baron Management. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #1 Notice of Removal,. Documents filed in wrong division as per document captions is incorrect. (TNS) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant McCormack Baron Management, Inc. d/b/a McCormack Baron Management from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands Division of St. Thomas and St. John, case number ST-18-CV-759. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0391-764983)filed by McCormack Baron Management, Inc. d/b/a McCormack Baron Management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Summons) (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCCORMACK BARON MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETER JAMES LYNCH