This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:46:37 (UTC).

Hopkins v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Hopkins filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard W. Story. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02968

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard W. Story

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barbara Hopkins

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William L Bross, IV

Attorney at Heninger Garrison & Davis, LLC - AL

2224 1St Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Caroline Hollingsworth

Attorney at Heninger Garrison & Davis, LLC - AL

2224 1St Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER granting (589) Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Deposition of Oliver Martini and Production of Documents in case 1:17-md-02782-RWS. The parties are directed to meet and confer concerning the details since Plaintiffs' original requested deposition date is no longer feasible. The parties shall decide upon a mutually agreed date for Mr. Martini to be deposed as well as a timeline in advance of the deposition date to provide Plaintiffs with the document production at least 21 days before the scheduled deposition. (See Order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#3

(#3) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 22 - (Amended Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order - Trial Cases) Selection of Trial Cases: James Bovian 1:17-cv-04840; Jim B. and Diane Crumbley 1:18-cv-00748; Danielle Guffey 1:18-cv-00402; Jeffrey Smith 1:17-cv-05031. Dispositive or Daubert motions shall be filed in the First Trial Case by July 31, 2020. Responses shall be filed by August 28, 2020. Replies shall be filed by September 7, 2020. By August 14, 2020, each party shall serve designations of deposition testimony proposed in the First Trial Case to be introduced into evidence at trial. Motions in Limine: First Trial Case shall be filed by September 21, 2020. Response briefs shall be filed by October 5, 2020. For any motions in limine filed prior to the deadline above, the response brief shall be filed within 21 days and any reply brief shall be filed within 7 days. Plaintiffs' seeking exclusion of FDA evidence, Defendants' response brief is due on August 3, 2020 and Plaintiffs' reply will be due by August 10, 2010. Exhibit and Witness List: October 13, 2020. Joint Pretrial Order: October 15, 2020. Final Pretrial Conference: October 22, 2010 at 10:00 am. Trial of the First Trial Case shall begin on November 2, 2020. The trial is expected to last two (2) to (3) weeks. Second Trial Selection: Defendants shall select the second case to be tried from the Trial Cases by October 12, 2020. Dispositive or Daubert motions shall be filed in the Second Trial Case by December 1, 2020. Responses shall be filed by December 14, 2020. Replies shall be filed by January 1, 2021. Trial of the Second Trial Case shall begin on February 22, 2021. The trial is expected to last two (2) to three (3) weeks. The third trial setting shall be a consolidated trial. The court will set a time for the parties to be heard on the makeup of the consolidation. The trial will begin on May 10, 2021. The trial is expected to last three (3) to four (4) weeks. All remaining deadlines for the third trial setting will be established by subsequent Order of the Court. (See order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#2

(#2) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Barbara Hopkins. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9921452) DIRECT FILE MDL - Maryland, Northern. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting (589) Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Deposition of Oliver Martini and Production of Documents in case 1:17-md-02782-RWS. The parties are directed to meet and confer concerning the details since Plaintiffs' original requested deposition date is no longer feasible. The parties shall decide upon a mutually agreed date for Mr. Martini to be deposed as well as a timeline in advance of the deposition date to provide Plaintiffs with the document production at least 21 days before the scheduled deposition. (See Order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 22 - (Amended Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order - Trial Cases) Selection of Trial Cases: James Bovian 1:17-cv-04840; Jim B. and Diane Crumbley 1:18-cv-00748; Danielle Guffey 1:18-cv-00402; Jeffrey Smith 1:17-cv-05031. Dispositive or Daubert motions shall be filed in the First Trial Case by July 31, 2020. Responses shall be filed by August 28, 2020. Replies shall be filed by September 7, 2020. By August 14, 2020, each party shall serve designations of deposition testimony proposed in the First Trial Case to be introduced into evidence at trial. Motions in Limine: First Trial Case shall be filed by September 21, 2020. Response briefs shall be filed by October 5, 2020. For any motions in limine filed prior to the deadline above, the response brief shall be filed within 21 days and any reply brief shall be filed within 7 days. Plaintiffs' seeking exclusion of FDA evidence, Defendants' response brief is due on August 3, 2020 and Plaintiffs' reply will be due by August 10, 2010. Exhibit and Witness List: October 13, 2020. Joint Pretrial Order: October 15, 2020. Final Pretrial Conference: October 22, 2010 at 10:00 am. Trial of the First Trial Case shall begin on November 2, 2020. The trial is expected to last two (2) to (3) weeks. Second Trial Selection: Defendants shall select the second case to be tried from the Trial Cases by October 12, 2020. Dispositive or Daubert motions shall be filed in the Second Trial Case by December 1, 2020. Responses shall be filed by December 14, 2020. Replies shall be filed by January 1, 2021. Trial of the Second Trial Case shall begin on February 22, 2021. The trial is expected to last two (2) to three (3) weeks. The third trial setting shall be a consolidated trial. The court will set a time for the parties to be heard on the makeup of the consolidation. The trial will begin on May 10, 2021. The trial is expected to last three (3) to four (4) weeks. All remaining deadlines for the third trial setting will be established by subsequent Order of the Court. (See order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Barbara Hopkins. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9921452) DIRECT FILE MDL - Maryland, Northern. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less